This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 09:06:58 (UTC).

Bel Power Solutions Inc. v. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Bel Power Solutions Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00655

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bel Power Solutions Inc.

Defendant

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Defendant Attorneys

Barry K. Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Coburn LLP

311 Rr 620 S, Suite 205

Austin, TX 78734-4775

Bryan Wilson

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

755 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Diek O. Van Nort

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rachel S. Dolphin

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Yue Li

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

755 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rachel S. Dolphin for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yue Li for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Diek O. Van Nort for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry K. Shelton for Rachel Dolphin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15114171) by on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry K. Shelton for Yue Li ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15114158) by on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry K. Shelton for Diek O. Van Nort ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15114134) by on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan Wilson for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry K. Shelton for Bryan Wilson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15092829) by on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bel Power Solutions Inc.. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Issued with return to admitted atty. Attorneys may request re-issuance after Pro-Hac Vice motions have been granted for additional counsel. (lad) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bel Power Solutions Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bel Power Solutions Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14946838), filed by Bel Power Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith