This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:03:03 (UTC).

Beiswenger v. Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Beiswenger filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Beiswenger

Defendants

Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.

Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. doing business as Red Wing Shoe Store

Not Classified By Court

Anthony Stites

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Cathy T Serrano

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Drew C Ambrose

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC - Ind/IN

211 N Pennsylvania St Ste 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Brian L McDermott

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC - Ind/IN

211 N Pennsylvania St Ste 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 3/6/2020.The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/20/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 12/18/2020; and from defendant(s) by 1/19/2021. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 4/14/2020 and for Defendant is 4/17/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 1/8/2021. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. The presiding judge will hold a status conference to set a final pretrial conference and trail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/5/2020. (mrm) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by attys Drew Ambrose and Brian McDermott. The #11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Serrano to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Ambrose and McDermott. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/25/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order.(FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Michael Beiswenger (Serrano, Cathy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint , Defenses and Affirmative Defenses by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc..(McDermott, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McDermott, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer due date as to Red Wings Brands of America, Inc. reset to 02/06/2020 per #10 Agreed Notice. (jat) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. ; answer due by February 6, 2020. (McDermott, Brian) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketJudge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L McDermott on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. (McDermott, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Drew C Ambrose on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. (Ambrose, Drew) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. of Proof of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Ambrose, Drew) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. (Ambrose, Drew) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Drew C Ambrose on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. (Ambrose, Drew) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT #5 *** Modified on 1/3/2020 (ace). Modified on 1/3/2020 (ace). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4105424.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1912-CT-000633, filed by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ambrose, Drew) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cathy T Serrano

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher C Myers