This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2019 at 07:34:43 (UTC).

Beggs v. The Control Group Media Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Beggs filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against The Control Group Media Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00106

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colton Wayne Beggs

Defendants

Instant Checkmate, LLC

The Control Group Media Company, Inc.

John Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew B Gallinger

Attorney at TOLLIVER LAW FIRM, P.C.

1004 Division Street, Po Box 1913

Billings, MT 59103-1913

Tyler T. Dugger

Attorney at TOLLIVER LAW FIRM, P.C.

1004 Division Street, Po Box 1913

Billings, MT 59103-1913

Defendant Attorney

Nathan A. Huey

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP - MISSOULA

201 W. Main Street, Suite 101

Missoula, MT 59802

 

Court Documents

#17

16 #5

Exhibit

16 #4

Exhibit

16 #3

Exhibit

16 #2

Exhibit

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

#15

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/4/2019. (JDR) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Colton Wayne Beggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Dugger, Tyler) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc.. (Huey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Huey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Nathan A. Huey appearing for Defendants Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Huey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate PubRec, LLC for Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc... (Huey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Tyler T. Dugger, Matthew B Gallinger, Nathan A. Huey. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/2/2019. (JEH) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Defendants answer due 11/22/2019. (HEG) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion. Defendants shall file their answers or responsive pleadings to the First Amended Complaint by November 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/28/2019. (HEG) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulated Motion Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Nathan A. Huey appearing for Defendants Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Huey, Nathan) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Huey on behalf of Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. (Huey, Nathan) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Colton Wayne Beggs. (Dugger, Tyler) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colton Wayne Beggs. Instant Checkmate, LLC served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Dugger, Tyler) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colton Wayne Beggs. The Control Group Media Company, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Dugger, Tyler) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/15/2019. (JDR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial Tyler T. Dugger appearing for Plaintiff Colton Wayne Beggs Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Dugger, Tyler) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summonses Issued as to Instant Checkmate, LLC and The Control Group Media Company, Inc. (JDR) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2379977 (AMC) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Colton Wayne Beggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Control Group Media Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where INSTANT CHECK MATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B Gallinger