Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2020 at 07:24:40 (UTC).

Begg v. See, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Begg filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against See, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03176

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Begg

Defendant

See, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan A Stieglitz

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jonathan A. Stieglitz

11845 W. Olympic Boulevard, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Jonathan A. Stieglitz

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jonathan A. Stieglitz

11845 W. Olympic Boulevard, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue, Suite 300

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/12/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce Begg. See, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to See, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

4 #1

NY Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14461469.) filed by Bruce Begg. (Attachments: #1 NY Certificate of Good Standing)(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against See, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14453795.). Filed byBruce Begg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/12/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce Begg. See, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to See, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14461469.) filed by Bruce Begg. (Attachments: #1 NY Certificate of Good Standing)(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/26/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against See, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14453795.). Filed byBruce Begg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stieglitz, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yitzchak Zelman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Stieglitz