This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:24:41 (UTC).

Beeson v. Elliott et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Beeson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Elliott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen, Kathleen L. DeSoto and Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen L. DeSoto

Presiding Judges

Dana L. Christensen

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor Anthony Beeson

Great Falls, MT 59404

Defendants

Tara J. Elliott

Troy Capser

Brandon Cray

Mrs. Strange

Dana L. Christensen

DHO Cortez

FBOP Western Regional Director

USP Victorville Complex Warden

Unknown Inmate Designation, Sentencing, Computatin

Medical Administrator

Correctional Officer Smith

Federal Judge

General Counsel

FCI Phoenix, AZ Warden

Kimberly Peterson

U.S. Probation Office Chief Officer

Food Admin (FCI Phoenix)

FCI Phoenix, AZ Facility Admin

Facility Admin

3 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Account Statement

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Taylor Anthony Beeson. (TAG) Modified on 12/6/2021: complaint deemed filed (TAG). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Beeson with docket sheet (TAG) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Dana L. Christensen recused. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/23/2021. Mailed to Beeson; BMM chambers notified (TAG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Brian Morris and referred to United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/23/2021. Mailed to Beeson (TAG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/6/2021. Mailed to Beeson (TAG) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Beeson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/6/2021. Mailed to Beeson and MCDF (TAG) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/6/2021) (TAG). (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#8

(#8) Mail sent to Beeson at MCDF Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice re #7 by MCDF (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Letter

#11

(#11) ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/29/2021. Mailed to Beeson (TAG) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/29/2021. Mailed to Beeson (TAG) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Summons and NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Plaintiff Taylor Anthony Beeson. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (MPB) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice re #7 by MCDF (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail sent to Beeson at MCDF Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Beeson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/6/2021. Mailed to Beeson and MCDF (TAG) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/6/2021) (TAG). (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/6/2021. Mailed to Beeson (TAG) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Brian Morris and referred to United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/23/2021. Mailed to Beeson (TAG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Dana L. Christensen recused. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/23/2021. Mailed to Beeson; BMM chambers notified (TAG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Beeson with docket sheet (TAG) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Taylor Anthony Beeson. (TAG) Modified on 12/6/2021: complaint deemed filed (TAG). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Taylor Anthony Beeson. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Judge is a litigant

Latest cases where Correctional Officer Smith is a litigant

Latest cases where Medical Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases where US PROBATION is a litigant