This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 07:52:55 (UTC).

Beebe v. Jimico Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Beebe filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Jimico Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Beebe

Defendants

Jimico Enterprises, Inc.

James Dammen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stanley J. Matusz

Attorney at Stan Matusz, Attorney at Law

29 Murfield Drive

Ithaca, NY 14850

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Affidavit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against James Dammen, Jimico Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4621093) filed by Danielle Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION and Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by Danielle Beebe submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Matusz, Stanley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/10/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jimico Enterprises, Inc.; James Dammen on 02/11/19, filed by Danielle Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Matusz, Stanley) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

2 #1

Summons Issued for James Dammen

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to James Dammen, Jimico Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for James Dammen)(hmr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER: approving the #5 Stipulation. The time for defendants James Dammen and Jimico Enterprises, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 3/25/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/25/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION and Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by Danielle Beebe submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Matusz, Stanley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • ***Answer due date updated for James Dammen answer due 3/4/2019; Jimico Enterprises, Inc. answer due 3/4/2019. (jdp, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jimico Enterprises, Inc.; James Dammen on 02/11/19, filed by Danielle Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Matusz, Stanley) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/10/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summonses Issued as to James Dammen, Jimico Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for James Dammen)(hmr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against James Dammen, Jimico Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4621093) filed by Danielle Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.