This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2022 at 11:02:34 (UTC).

Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning et al v. Shopify Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Bedford, Freeman Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Shopify Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01340

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning

Macmillan Holdings, LLC

Cengage Learning, Inc.

Elsevier Inc.

Elsevier B.V.

McGraw Hill LLC

Pearson Education, Inc.

Defendant

Shopify Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corey Michael Sclar Miller

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP (DC-NA)

4530 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Jeffery Walter Kane

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP (DC-NA)

4530 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Matthew Jan Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP (DC-NA)

4530 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Scott Alexander Zebrak

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Michele Harrington Murphy

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP (DC-NA)

4530 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Tomkowiak

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC-NA)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Elizabeth Greenman

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (CA-NA)

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Laura Elizabeth Bladow

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Nicholas Schlossman

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC-NA)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Joshua Forrest Pescud Long

Attorney at Woods Rogers PLC

10 S Jefferson St, Po Box 14125

Roanoke, VA 24011

Melanie Grindle

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (CA/NA)

12670 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130

Allison Levine Stillman

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (NY-NA)

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Andrew Michael Gass

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (CA-NA)

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sarang Vijay Damle

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC-NA)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

David Lee Johnson

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Elana Nightingale Dawson

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC-NA)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Jessica Lyn Stebbins Bina

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (CA-NA)

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph Richard Wetzel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (CA-NA)

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

130 #14

Exhibit 13

130 #13

Exhibit 12

130 #9

Exhibit 8

130 #6

Exhibit 5

130 #5

Exhibit 4

130 #3

Exhibit 2

130 #2

Exhibit 1

127 #1

Proposed Order

#127

(#127) MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

4 #1

Attachment A

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an action regarding trademarks (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

3 #1

Attachment A

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B Trademarks

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A Copyrighted Works

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) NOTICE by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #1 Complaint, ATTACHMENT to Civil Cover Sheet (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

253 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) Memorandum in Opposition re #127 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer filed by Shopify Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua F.P. Long, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Bladow, Laura) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #127 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer (clar, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #127 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) Notice of Hearing Date Friday, July 1, 2022 re #127 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) Memorandum in Support re #127 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer filed by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopify's 56 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 06/10/2022, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/11/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2022. (jlan) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) ORDER, for the reasons stated from the bench, granting #113 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 06/10/2022. (wgar, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2022 re #113 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Defendant Shopifys 52 Third-Party Subpoenas & Statement on Meet-and-Confer filed by Elsevier B.V., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Elsevier Inc. Appearance of counsel for plaintiffs and defendant. Motion argued and GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) ORDER granting #122 Emergency Motion for Leave to be Excused from Compliance with Local Rule 83.1(F) at Tomorrow's Hearing. ORDERED that plaintiffs may appear at the hearing on June 10, 2022 without counsel admitted to practice in this court under Local Rule 83.1(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/9/2022. (swil) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michele H. Murphy and Certification of Local Counsel Scott A. Zebrak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8156999. by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Shopify Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons CORRECTED by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #1 Complaint, ATTACHMENT to Civil Cover Sheet (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an action regarding trademarks (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, McGraw Hill LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8129157.), filed by McGraw Hill LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Macmillan Holdings, LLC, Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC d/b/a Macmillan Learning, Elsevier Inc., Elsevier B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Copyrighted Works, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Trademarks)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELSEVIER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group, LLC doing business as Macmillan Higher Education is a litigant

Latest cases where Shopify, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where McGRAW HILL LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant