This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 08:44:15 (UTC).

Bedford County v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Bedford County filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against McKinsey Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05182

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bedford County

Defendant

McKinsey & Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry J. Scatton

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

2005 Market Street, Suite 350

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

John J. Berry

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP

301 Grant St. Suite 2800

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00101. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jjg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF COURT granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. This action is stayed in its entirety until the effective date of the Conditional Transfer Order transferring this Action to the new MDL. McKinsey's response to the Plaintiff's Complaint will not be due until 30 days after the effective date of the Conditional Transfer Order and a response is only required if Judge Breyer requires such a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/16/2021. (dlg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Berry, John) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bedford County, case number 276-2021 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number CPAWDC-6556674), filed by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Pennsylvania, 3:21-cv-00101-KRG, Bedford County v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-5182-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #5 CTO-3 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00101. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of Northern California. (jjg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jjg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF COURT granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. This action is stayed in its entirety until the effective date of the Conditional Transfer Order transferring this Action to the new MDL. McKinsey's response to the Plaintiff's Complaint will not be due until 30 days after the effective date of the Conditional Transfer Order and a response is only required if Judge Breyer requires such a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/16/2021. (dlg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Berry, John) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/18/2021. (jjg) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bedford County, case number 276-2021 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number CPAWDC-6556674), filed by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bedford County is a litigant

Latest cases where MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN J. BERRY