This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:39:19 (UTC).

Becnel et al v. Lamorak Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Becnel filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Lamorak Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14536

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Eagle Inc.

National Automative Parts Association

Turner Industries Group LLC

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

CBS Corporation

Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC

Uniroyal, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Ford Motor Company

Volkswagon Group of America Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Occidental Chemical Corporation

General Electric Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc

Genuine Parts Company

Honeywell International, Inc.

Pope's Parts Inc.

Cross Claimant, Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Eagle Inc.

National Automative Parts Association

Turner Industries Group LLC

International Paper

CBS Corporation

Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC

Uniroyal, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Ford Motor Company

Volkswagon Group of America Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Occidental Chemical Corporation

General Electric Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc

Genuine Parts Company

Honeywell International, Inc.

Pope's Parts Inc.

3Rd Party Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Paul D. Palermo

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kassie Lee Richbourg

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Gretchen F. Richards

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mark N. Bodin

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC (New Orleans)

601 Poydras St., 12Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Adam Devlin deMahy

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kevin M. Wheeler

Attorney at Taggart Morton, LLC

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70163-2100

Julia Ann Dietz

Attorney at Degan, Blanchard & Nash (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lawrence G. Pugh, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. The Court will consider defendants' supplemental case authority in support of the Avondale interests' opposition to plaintiffs' motion to remand. While acknowledging courtesies here, but to save trees and avoid needless expansion in the record, a simple reference with citation to another court's potentially relevant opinion and holding will suffice in the future. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/31/2020. (ko) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#22

(#22) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Melancon, David) Modified on 2/3/2020 (pp). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

21 #3

Exhibit

21 #2

Proposed Order

21 #1

Memorandum in Support

#21

(#21) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#20

(#20) Supplemental Memorandum filed by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

7 #14

Exhibit 11

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (pp) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. The Court will consider defendants' supplemental case authority in support of the Avondale interests' opposition to plaintiffs' motion to remand. While acknowledging courtesies here, but to save trees and avoid needless expansion in the record, a simple reference with citation to another court's potentially relevant opinion and holding will suffice in the future. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/31/2020. (ko) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Melancon, David) Modified on 2/3/2020 (pp). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Supplemental Memorandum filed by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/21/2020. (ko) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Supplemental Memorandum filed by American Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company, in Opposition of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 01/21/2020. (ko) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Response to Sur-Reply)(Clement, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (jls) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/3/2020. (clw) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 1/2/2020 (pp). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jacqueline D Becnel, James P Becnel, Jr, Sheila Becnel Eschete. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30)(Clement, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company,identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, identifying Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V., identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE. (Dietz, Julia) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (pp). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (pp) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-7596 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8020832) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pp).(Melancon, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/13/2019) (jls). Modified text on 12/17/2019 (pp). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Turner Industries Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Inc. is a litigant