This case was last updated from PACER on 03/22/2019 at 07:20:58 (UTC).

Beckles v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 Beckles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geraldine Beckles

Jacksonville, NC 28540

Defendant

Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Justin N. Davis

Attorney at Mullen Holland & Cooper, P.A.

301 South York Street

Gastonia, NC 28053-0488

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Envelope

10 #2

Affidavit of Samuel Popkin

10 #1

Affidavit of Geraldine Beckles

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Order regarding #9 Order filed by Geraldine Beckles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Geraldine Beckles, #2 Affidavit of Samuel Popkin, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER - Samuel S. Popkin, you are ORDERED to come to this court and show cause why you should not be held in contempt. Hearing shall be held at 1:30 P.M. on Tuesday, March 26, 2019, at New Bern. You will SERVE a copy of this order upon your client. Decision on your motion to withdraw will be considered at the March 26, 2019, hearing. You will file in advance of that hearing, no later than March 19, 2019, affidavit attesting to 1) service of your motion to withdraw upon your client; 2) her position on this motion; 3) service of this order upon your client together with all case filings including but not limited to those related to defendant's motion to dismiss; and 4) her mailing address. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/11/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Samuel S. Popkin, Attorney at Law at 1007 Hargett St., Suite 1, Jacksonville, NC 28540 and emailed to Samuel S. Popkin at ssplaw59@gmail.com.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Service filed by Geraldine Beckles regarding 2/14/2019 Text Order. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

7 #2

Envelope

7 #1

Cover Letter

#7

(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Samuel S. Popkin for Geraldine Beckles. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Justin N. Davis on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Justin) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Justin) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#2

TEXT ORDER - Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan, where ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger these activities in preface to its entry of a case management order through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Unless a party raises objection to a stay of these activities, pending completion of briefing on the motion now at issue, and decision thereon by this court, in filing due within 14 days from date of entry of this order, the court will stay that aspect of the case so as to promote focus on the issues raised in defendant's motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/5/2019. This docket text entry is the official and binding order of the court and intentionally is not accompanied by a separate document. (See Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, section V.I.2.) A copy of this Text Order was emailed to plaintiff's counsel, Samuel Popkin at ssplaw59@gmail.com, with an additional courtesy copy of Notice #2 . (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Motions to Dismiss and Answer

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Summons

#1

(#2) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Samuel S. Popkin, Attorney at Law at 1007 Hargett St., Suite 1, Jacksonville, NC 28540 mailed via US Mail on January 23, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to Order regarding #9 Order filed by Geraldine Beckles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Geraldine Beckles, #2 Affidavit of Samuel Popkin, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • ****Set Hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 3/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in New Bern before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - Samuel S. Popkin, you are ORDERED to come to this court and show cause why you should not be held in contempt. Hearing shall be held at 1:30 P.M. on Tuesday, March 26, 2019, at New Bern. You will SERVE a copy of this order upon your client. Decision on your motion to withdraw will be considered at the March 26, 2019, hearing. You will file in advance of that hearing, no later than March 19, 2019, affidavit attesting to 1) service of your motion to withdraw upon your client; 2) her position on this motion; 3) service of this order upon your client together with all case filings including but not limited to those related to defendant's motion to dismiss; and 4) her mailing address. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/11/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Samuel S. Popkin, Attorney at Law at 1007 Hargett St., Suite 1, Jacksonville, NC 28540 and emailed to Samuel S. Popkin at ssplaw59@gmail.com.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Service filed by Geraldine Beckles regarding 2/14/2019 Text Order. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Samuel S. Popkin for Geraldine Beckles. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff, you are noticed that Samuel S. Popkin, your attorney, has failed timely to enter any notice of appearance in this court to which your case was removed, and, therefore, you are proceeding pro se. He informed the clerk 2/12/19 that he is not admitted to practice in this court and has been too busy due to other professional commitments to withdraw or find new counsel for you. This does not toll your response time to the motion to dismiss filed 2/4/19. If you are in fact representing yourself now you have responsibilities also under our Local Civil Rules to make this known. If you have new counsel, it is incumbent upon you to cause said counsel to notice his or her appearance. Mr. Popkin, you will deliver this text order to your client immediately and mail a certificate acknowledging the place and time of said delivery to the clerk's office for filing not later than February 21, 2019. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/14/2019. (A copy of this Text Order was sent via US mail to Samuel S. Popkin, Attorney at Law at 1007 Hargett St., Suite 1, Jacksonville, NC 28540 and emailed to Samuel S. Popkin at ssplaw59@gmail.com.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER - Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan, where ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger these activities in preface to its entry of a case management order through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Unless a party raises objection to a stay of these activities, pending completion of briefing on the motion now at issue, and decision thereon by this court, in filing due within 14 days from date of entry of this order, the court will stay that aspect of the case so as to promote focus on the issues raised in defendant's motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/5/2019. This docket text entry is the official and binding order of the court and intentionally is not accompanied by a separate document. (See Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, section V.I.2.) A copy of this Text Order was emailed to plaintiff's counsel, Samuel Popkin at ssplaw59@gmail.com, with an additional courtesy copy of Notice #2 . (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Memorandum in Support regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Justin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Justin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Notice to Counsel. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) if, at the time of removal, a motion is pending for which no supporting memorandum of law has been submitted to the state court, the movant on that motion shall file a supporting memorandum within 14 days of the date of removal, unless the motion is of a type covered by Local Civil Rule 77.2 or unless otherwise ordered by the court. The Local Civil Rule 7.1(f) deadline for a response to the motion runs from the date of the movant's filing of a supporting memorandum in this court. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Justin N. Davis on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Justin) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Justin) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Samuel S. Popkin, Attorney at Law at 1007 Hargett St., Suite 1, Jacksonville, NC 28540 mailed via US Mail on January 23, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the JS44 Civil Cover Sheet and the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action needed at this time. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. from General Court of Justice - Superior Court Division - Onslow County, case number 18-CVS-2916. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4797884), filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Motions to Dismiss and Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Davis, Justin) (Attachment 4 flattened and replaced on 1/24/2019) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.