This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 21:31:37 (UTC).

Beckerich et al v. Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Beckerich filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christy Beckerich

Meghan Bentle

Morgan Bishop

Christa Bowdler

Rebecca Braunwart

Eileen Brinkman

Kim Brown

Andrea Burg

Stacey Caldwell

Jennifer Carlton

Veronica Crump

Carrisa Daugherty

Nichole Doyle

Deanna Dudley

Andrea Halkiotis

April Hoskins

Maliza Jackson

Tiffany Justice

Heather King

Ronald Klotz

156 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenn D Feagan

Rockefeller Building, 14Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Other Attorneys

Jean Geoppinger McCoy

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP

255 East Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Christopher Markus

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger LaVelle psc

207 Thomas More Parkway

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

Michael Joseph Enzweiler

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger LaVelle psc

207 Thomas More Parkway

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

Aaron Mark Herzig

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Beth A. Bryan

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister

425 Walnut St., Ste. 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Russell S Sayre

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister - 1

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202-3957

Allison Knerr

Attorney at Dinsmore and Shohl

255 E. Fifth St., Ste. 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

David Paul Kamp

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

255 East Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jon David Brittingham

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - 1

Suite 1900, 255 E 5Th Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Bradley D McPeek

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame - 1

312 Walnut Stret, Suite 3100

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4091

Elizabeth M. Johnson

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame Co. L.P.A

312 Walnut Street, Cincinnati

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Matthew C Curran

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame

310 Walnut Street, Suite 3100

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Patricia Anderson Pryor

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Amanda Brooke Burton

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp

One East Fourth Street, Suite 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

James Eugene Burke, III

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp - 1

One E Fourth Street, Suite 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Taylor Michelle Beckham

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp

1 East 4Th Street, Ste 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Thomas Joseph Wiencek

Attorney at Mercy Health

C/O 388 South Main Street, Suite 500

Akron, OH 44311-4407

William Alan Posey

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp - 1

One E Fourth Street, Suite 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Brittany Aldridge, James Allen, Glenda Anderson, Matthew Barkimer, Christy Beckerich, Glenn Beier, Meghan Bentle, Morgan Bishop, Darris Bohman, Christa Bowdler, Dawn Bowman, Rebecca Braunwart, Richard Briggs, Eileen Brinkman, Michael Brock, Kim Brown, Ronnie Brown, Elissa Buonpane, Andrea Burg, Heather Bynum, Stacey Caldwell, Rachel Campbell, Jennifer Carlton, Caroline Cieminski, Ariel Colwell, James Cooper, Donna Crase, Veronica Crump, Natalie Cunningham, Carrisa Daugherty, Alaina Davis, Leslie Davis, Gemma Depperschmidt, Chastity Donk, Emily Dowden, Jamie Downton, Nichole Doyle, Deanna Dudley, Tracey Durrough, Kimberly Dutze, Tamra Elders, Greg Ellington, Danielle Forman, Danielle Forman, Shauna Freiberger, Shannon Frey, Janet Fritsch, Ron Gerdes, Rebecca Gerrein, Joseph Greer, Joseph Greer, Melinda Griesmann, Shelley Haas, Shelley Haas, Andrea Halkiotis, Andrea Harb, Tammy Hardin, Shannon Heeg, Emily Heffner, Hannah Heilman, Angela Hicks, Abigail Hilton, Dustie Hogue, April Hoskins, Toni Iacobucci, Maliza Jackson, Vanessa Johnson, Paula Jump, Tiffany Justice, Shelly Keller, Heather King, Ronald Klotz, Susan Klotz, Jennifer Koenig, Tonya Lanham, Amy Lemker, Joyce Life-Ishmael, Olivia Liggett, Hope Love, Teresa Lynch, Cheryl Macklin, Emily Madonis, Tracy Mallery, Dawn Malone, Tiffany Manning, Karen Manter, Lindsay McFarland, Jennifer Miller, Jeanie Mills, Austin Montanez, Ronda Montano, Michelle Morath, Andrea Moreno, Victoria Morse, Elizabeth Mozea, Lisa Muldoon, Gary Myers, Julie Myrick, Crystal Napier, Jenny Neiser, Christine O'Neill, Desiree Ochs, Shannon Osterfeld, Jill Pabst, Joy Patrick, Valerie Patrick, Davee Pennington, Angela Perin, Shawneice Pernell, Kea Peters, Todd Peters, Stephanie Phelps, Jennifer Phillips, Michelle Pierce, Stephanie Porter, Amanda Preston-Clapper, Heather Rapp, Sarah Reed, Lara Reeves, Kelly Reynolds, Valerie Rose, Raenna Roth, Kim Ruedebusch, Michael Saal, Brian Schmadel, Andrea Sellars, Samantha Shannon, Seneca Sheldon, Constance Shepard, Kimberly Shrout, Jennifer Siders, Monica Smith, Christina Stafford, Marcie Stahl, Abigail Stedman, Taylor Stewart, Shannon Storm-Sieg, Susan Streicher, Deela Sturm, Sandra Summe, Suzanne Thomas, Donna Tidball, Mary Toennis, Brendalee Travis, Nancy Vanpelt, Phillip Vaught, Maja Vickers, Jessica Walker, Greta Westermeyer, Mindy Wiederhold, Isabelle Wiehe, Latonya Williams, Tricia Williams, Melissa Wills, Taylor Wilson, Rebekkah Winkler, Kim Woolums, Thomas Wright, William Wring, Brittany Young, Mark Young (Feagan, Glenn) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendant Cincinnati Children Hospital Medical Center (Herzig, Aaron) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant University of Cincinnati Physicians Company, LLC (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant University of Cincinnati Medical Center, LLC (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#7

1 #20

Summons Form Mercy Health Physicians Cincinnati LLC

1 #18

Summons Form Mercy Health - Anderson

1 #17

Summons Form Bon Secours Mercy Health Inc.

1 #15

Summons Form University of Cincinnati Physicians

1 #14

Summons Form University of Cincinnati Medical Center, LLC

1 #9

Summons Form TriHealth Oak St.

1 #7

Summons Form The Christ Hospital Physicians, LLC

1 #3

Summons Form Saint Elizabeth Medical Center

1 #1

Main Document

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judge agrees that this case and case numbers 1:21-cv-548 and 1:21-cv-576 are related. All cases remain with Judge Black. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/20/2021. (kl) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Transcript of Proceedings, Preliminary Phone Conference, held on September 10, 2021, before Judge Timothy S. Black. Court Reporter Sue Lopreato, Telephone number 513.564.7679. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2021. (mal) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (rrs) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Brittany Aldridge, James Allen, Glenda Anderson, Matthew Barkimer, Christy Beckerich, Glenn Beier, Meghan Bentle, Morgan Bishop, Darris Bohman, Christa Bowdler, Dawn Bowman, Rebecca Braunwart, Richard Briggs, Eileen Brinkman, Michael Brock, Kim Brown, Ronnie Brown, Elissa Buonpane, Andrea Burg, Heather Bynum, Stacey Caldwell, Rachel Campbell, Jennifer Carlton, Caroline Cieminski, Ariel Colwell, James Cooper, Donna Crase, Veronica Crump, Natalie Cunningham, Carrisa Daugherty, Alaina Davis, Leslie Davis, Gemma Depperschmidt, Chastity Donk, Emily Dowden, Jamie Downton, Nichole Doyle, Deanna Dudley, Tracey Durrough, Kimberly Dutze, Tamra Elders, Greg Ellington, Danielle Forman, Danielle Forman, Shauna Freiberger, Shannon Frey, Janet Fritsch, Ron Gerdes, Rebecca Gerrein, Joseph Greer, Joseph Greer, Melinda Griesmann, Shelley Haas, Shelley Haas, Andrea Halkiotis, Andrea Harb, Tammy Hardin, Shannon Heeg, Emily Heffner, Hannah Heilman, Angela Hicks, Abigail Hilton, Dustie Hogue, April Hoskins, Toni Iacobucci, Maliza Jackson, Vanessa Johnson, Paula Jump, Tiffany Justice, Shelly Keller, Heather King, Ronald Klotz, Susan Klotz, Jennifer Koenig, Tonya Lanham, Amy Lemker, Joyce Life-Ishmael, Olivia Liggett, Hope Love, Teresa Lynch, Cheryl Macklin, Emily Madonis, Tracy Mallery, Dawn Malone, Tiffany Manning, Karen Manter, Lindsay McFarland, Jennifer Miller, Jeanie Mills, Austin Montanez, Ronda Montano, Michelle Morath, Andrea Moreno, Victoria Morse, Elizabeth Mozea, Lisa Muldoon, Gary Myers, Julie Myrick, Crystal Napier, Jenny Neiser, Christine O'Neill, Desiree Ochs, Shannon Osterfeld, Jill Pabst, Joy Patrick, Valerie Patrick, Davee Pennington, Angela Perin, Shawneice Pernell, Kea Peters, Todd Peters, Stephanie Phelps, Jennifer Phillips, Michelle Pierce, Stephanie Porter, Amanda Preston-Clapper, Heather Rapp, Sarah Reed, Lara Reeves, Kelly Reynolds, Valerie Rose, Raenna Roth, Kim Ruedebusch, Michael Saal, Brian Schmadel, Andrea Sellars, Samantha Shannon, Seneca Sheldon, Constance Shepard, Kimberly Shrout, Jennifer Siders, Monica Smith, Christina Stafford, Marcie Stahl, Abigail Stedman, Taylor Stewart, Shannon Storm-Sieg, Susan Streicher, Deela Sturm, Sandra Summe, Suzanne Thomas, Donna Tidball, Mary Toennis, Brendalee Travis, Nancy Vanpelt, Phillip Vaught, Maja Vickers, Jessica Walker, Greta Westermeyer, Mindy Wiederhold, Isabelle Wiehe, Latonya Williams, Tricia Williams, Melissa Wills, Taylor Wilson, Rebekkah Winkler, Kim Woolums, Thomas Wright, William Wring, Brittany Young, Mark Young (Feagan, Glenn) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendant Cincinnati Children Hospital Medical Center (Herzig, Aaron) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court for an informal conference by telephone pursuant to Local Rule 65 on 9/10/2021 at 2:30 p.m. Jim Maus, in place of Glenn Feagan, appeared for Plaintiffs. Christopher Markus, Michael Enzweiler, and Mark Guilfoyle appeared for Saint Elizabeth Defendants. Russell Sayre, Beth Bryan, and Aaron Herzig appeared for Cincinnati Childrens. David Kamp, Allison Knerr, Jean McCoy, and Jon Brittingham appeared for Christ Hospital Defendants. Bradley McPeek appeared for Trihealth Defendants. Patricia Pryor appeared for University of Cincinnati Defendants. James Burke, William Posey, Amanda Stubblefield, Richard Creighton, and Thomas Wiencek appeared for Mercy Health Defendants. The Court set a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order. Plaintiffs discussed potential expert testimony not yet presented. Plaintiffs SHALL present such evidence, if any, on or before 9/13/2021. Responses in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for TRO are due 9/14/2021. Reply memo, if any, is due 9/16/2021. The Court does not intend to set a hearing, unless the Court deems it necessary after briefing, given the immediate nature of Plaintiffs request. The Court will rule expeditiously. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter: Maria Lopreato) (bjc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8491939) of Mark D. Guilfoyle and Nicholas C. Birkenhauer by Defendants Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Markus, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant University of Cincinnati Physicians Company, LLC (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant University of Cincinnati Medical Center, LLC (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant UC Health, LLC (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Enzweiler for Defendants Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc. (Enzweiler, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotation Order and Notice of Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rule 65.1, this civil action is set for an informal preliminary conference on 9/10/2021 at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel SHALL, in good faith, make all reasonable efforts to identify counsel for the currently-unrepresented Defendants and notify those Defendants of the hearing. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Given the number of parties, all participants SHALL remain muted until otherwise instructed by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/7/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D McPeek for Defendants Bethesda Hospital, Inc., Bethesda North, Good Samaritan Hospital, Trihealth, Inc. (McPeek, Bradley) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William Alan Posey for Defendants Bon Secours Mercy Health Inc., Mercy Health - Anderson, Mercy Health Cincinnati, LLC, Mercy Health Physicians Cincinnati LLC, Mercy Health West Hospitals, LLC, The Jewish Hospital, LLC (Posey, William) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S Sayre for Defendant Cincinnati Children Hospital Medical Center (Sayre, Russell) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bethesda Hospital, Inc., Bethesda North, Bon Secours Mercy Health Inc., Christ Hospital, Cincinnati Children Hospital Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Mercy Health - Anderson, Mercy Health Cincinnati, LLC, Mercy Health Physicians Cincinnati LLC, Mercy Health West Hospitals, LLC, Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc., The Christ Hospital Physicians, LLC, The Jewish Hospital, LLC, Trihealth, Inc., UC Health, LLC, University of Cincinnati Medical Center, LLC, University of Cincinnati Physicians Company, LLC. (bjc) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Brittany Aldridge, James Allen, Glenda Anderson, Matthew Barkimer, Christy Beckerich, Glenn Beier, Meghan Bentle, Morgan Bishop, Darris Bohman, Christa Bowdler, Dawn Bowman, Rebecca Braunwart, Richard Briggs, Eileen Brinkman, Michael Brock, Kim Brown, Ronnie Brown, Elissa Buonpane, Andrea Burg, Heather Bynum, Stacey Caldwell, Rachel Campbell, Jennifer Carlton, Caroline Cieminski, Ariel Colwell, James Cooper, Donna Crase, Veronica Crump, Natalie Cunningham, Carrisa Daugherty, Alaina Davis, Leslie Davis, Gemma Depperschmidt, Chastity Donk, Emily Dowden, Jamie Downton, Nichole Doyle, Deanna Dudley, Tracey Durrough, Kimberly Dutze, Tamra Elders, Greg Ellington, Danielle Forman, Danielle Forman, Shauna Freiberger, Shannon Frey, Janet Fritsch, Ron Gerdes, Rebecca Gerrein, Joseph Greer, Joseph Greer, Melinda Griesmann, Shelley Haas, Shelley Haas, Andrea Halkiotis, Andrea Harb, Tammy Hardin, Shannon Heeg, Emily Heffner, Hannah Heilman, Angela Hicks, Abigail Hilton, Dustie Hogue, April Hoskins, Toni Iacobucci, Maliza Jackson, Vanessa Johnson, Paula Jump, Tiffany Justice, Shelly Keller, Heather King, Ronald Klotz, Susan Klotz, Jennifer Koenig, Tonya Lanham, Amy Lemker, Joyce Life-Ishmael, Olivia Liggett, Hope Love, Teresa Lynch, Cheryl Macklin, Emily Madonis, Tracy Mallery, Dawn Malone, Tiffany Manning, Karen Manter, Lindsay McFarland, Jennifer Miller, Jeanie Mills, Austin Montanez, Ronda Montano, Michelle Morath, Andrea Moreno, Victoria Morse, Elizabeth Mozea, Lisa Muldoon, Gary Myers, Julie Myrick, Crystal Napier, Jenny Neiser, Christine O'Neill, Desiree Ochs, Shannon Osterfeld, Jill Pabst, Joy Patrick, Valerie Patrick, Davee Pennington, Angela Perin, Shawneice Pernell, Kea Peters, Todd Peters, Stephanie Phelps, Jennifer Phillips, Michelle Pierce, Stephanie Porter, Amanda Preston-Clapper, Heather Rapp, Sarah Reed, Lara Reeves, Kelly Reynolds, Valerie Rose, Raenna Roth, Kim Ruedebusch, Michael Saal, Brian Schmadel, Andrea Sellars, Samantha Shannon, Seneca Sheldon, Constance Shepard, Kimberly Shrout, Jennifer Siders, Monica Smith, Christina Stafford, Marcie Stahl, Abigail Stedman, Taylor Stewart, Shannon Storm-Sieg, Susan Streicher, Deela Sturm, Sandra Summe, Suzanne Thomas, Donna Tidball, Mary Toennis, Brendalee Travis, Nancy Vanpelt, Phillip Vaught, Maja Vickers, Jessica Walker, Greta Westermeyer, Mindy Wiederhold, Isabelle Wiehe, Latonya Williams, Tricia Williams, Melissa Wills, Taylor Wilson, Rebekkah Winkler, Kim Woolums, Thomas Wright, William Wring, Brittany Young, Mark Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Feagan, Glenn). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 9/8/2021 (eh). (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Geoppinger McCoy for Defendants Christ Hospital, The Christ Hospital Physicians, LLC (McCoy, Jean) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8483859), filed by Monica Smith, Rebecca Gerrein, Elissa Buonpane, Jennifer Koenig, Glenda Anderson, Victoria Morse, Tiffany Justice, Greg Ellington, April Hoskins, Jamie Downton, Dawn Malone, Latonya Williams, Joy Patrick, Mindy Wiederhold, Shannon Osterfeld, Janet Fritsch, Ronald Klotz, Samantha Shannon, Dustie Hogue, Ronnie Brown, Joseph Greer, Seneca Sheldon, Phillip Vaught, Veronica Crump, Kea Peters, Chastity Donk, Sarah Reed, Christine O'Neill, Mark Young, Kelly Reynolds, Constance Shepard, Donna Tidball, Jennifer Phillips, Teresa Lynch, Andrea Halkiotis, Kim Ruedebusch, Lara Reeves, Suzanne Thomas, Andrea Moreno, Olivia Liggett, Valerie Patrick, Darris Bohman, Tricia Williams, Tammy Hardin, Abigail Stedman, Toni Iacobucci, Maliza Jackson, Meghan Bentle, Susan Streicher, Kimberly Shrout, Gemma Depperschmidt, Amanda Preston-Clapper, Deanna Dudley, Marcie Stahl, Emily Heffner, Rachel Campbell, Melinda Griesmann, Elizabeth Mozea, Taylor Stewart, Todd Peters, Tamra Elders, Lindsay McFarland, Michelle Pierce, Donna Crase, Jeanie Mills, Tiffany Manning, Ron Gerdes, Andrea Sellars, Nancy Vanpelt, Shauna Freiberger, Andrea Burg, Abigail Hilton, Greta Westermeyer, Rebekkah Winkler, Emily Dowden, Rebecca Braunwart, Christina Stafford, Thomas Wright, Susan Klotz, Kim Brown, Gary Myers, Stephanie Porter, Glenn Beier, Paula Jump, Tonya Lanham, Julie Myrick, Brendalee Travis, Brian Schmadel, Jessica Walker, Ariel Colwell, Desiree Ochs, Jennifer Carlton, Shannon Storm-Sieg, Vanessa Johnson, Kim Woolums, Heather Bynum, Shannon Frey, Raenna Roth, Dawn Bowman, Shawneice Pernell, Austin Montanez, Leslie Davis, Shelley Haas, Melissa Wills, Brittany Young, Angela Hicks, Carrisa Daugherty, Richard Briggs, Hope Love, Karen Manter, Tracey Durrough, Kimberly Dutze, Heather King, Tracy Mallery, Shelly Keller, Shannon Heeg, Christy Beckerich, Taylor Wilson, Michael Brock, Heather Rapp, Mary Toennis, Matthew Barkimer, Valerie Rose, Michelle Morath, Hannah Heilman, Lisa Muldoon, Caroline Cieminski, Angela Perin, William Wring, Sandra Summe, Crystal Napier, Jenny Neiser, Jill Pabst, Michael Saal, Andrea Harb, Emily Madonis, Ronda Montano, Cheryl Macklin, Alaina Davis, Brittany Aldridge, Natalie Cunningham, Amy Lemker, Davee Pennington, Danielle Forman, Nichole Doyle, Stephanie Phelps, Eileen Brinkman, James Allen, Maja Vickers, Morgan Bishop, Jennifer Siders, Stacey Caldwell, James Cooper, Joyce Life-Ishmael, Isabelle Wiethe, Christa Bowdler, Deela Sturm, Jennifer Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, #4 Summons Form Summit Medical Group, #5 Summons Form Cincinnati Children's, #6 Summons Form Christ Hospital, #7 Summons Form The Christ Hospital Physicians, LLC, #8 Summons Form TriHealth Eden Park, #9 Summons Form TriHealth Oak St., #10 Summons Form Bethesda Hospital, Inc., #11 Summons Form Bethesda North, #12 Summons Form Good Samaritan Hospital, #13 Summons Form UC Health, LLC, #14 Summons Form University of Cincinnati Medical Center, LLC, #15 Summons Form University of Cincinnati Physicians, #16 Summons Form Mercy Health Cincinnati, LLC, #17 Summons Form Bon Secours Mercy Health Inc., #18 Summons Form Mercy Health - Anderson, #19 Summons Form Mercy Health West Hospitals, LLC, #20 Summons Form Mercy Health Physicians Cincinnati LLC, #21 Summons Form The Jewish Hospital, LLC) (Feagan, Glenn) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley D McPeek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Alan Posey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Paul Kamp