This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 08:56:23 (UTC).

Hurd v. USIC LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Hurd filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against USIC LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Michael D. Nelson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00295

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Susanne Becker

Scottsbluff, NE 69361

Susanne R. Hurd

Scottsbluff, NE 69361

Defendants

USIC LLC

CenturyLink

Mediacom

City of Volga

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

9 #1

Form Affidavit

#9

(#9) ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to send the appropriate form affidavit to Becker to file with her motion. Becker may either (1) submit the completed affidavit to the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order, at which time the Court will consider Becker's ability to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, or (2) pay the required filing fee for a notice of appeal. (Attachments: #1 Form Affidavit). Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#8

(#8) COPY OF IFP MEMO prepared by Deputy Clerk and sent to Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. regarding Notice of Appeal #6 as to Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (LKO) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of regarding Order,, Terminated Case, #5 , MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis #6 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd (Hurd, Susanne) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Order #5 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) Modified on 9/15/2021 to change event to a Notice of Appeal per RFR chambers (LKO). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER - This action is remanded to the District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court shall refund Susanne R. Hurd any filing fees she submitted in this action. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party; emailed to finance) (LKO) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#3

(#3) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against CenturyLink, City of Volga, Mediacom, and USIC LLC from Scottsbluff County District Court, Case number CI21-596 with receipt number 8061055, in the amount of $ 402; with attached state court pleadings filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Susanne Becker. (LKO) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to send the appropriate form affidavit to Becker to file with her motion. Becker may either (1) submit the completed affidavit to the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order, at which time the Court will consider Becker's ability to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, or (2) pay the required filing fee for a notice of appeal. (Attachments: #1 Form Affidavit). Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COPY OF IFP MEMO prepared by Deputy Clerk and sent to Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. regarding Notice of Appeal #6 as to Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (LKO) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of regarding Order,, Terminated Case, #5 , MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis #6 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd (Hurd, Susanne) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Order #5 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) Modified on 9/15/2021 to change event to a Notice of Appeal per RFR chambers (LKO). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - This action is remanded to the District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court shall refund Susanne R. Hurd any filing fees she submitted in this action. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party; emailed to finance) (LKO) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRemark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Susanne Becker (also known as Susanne R. Hurd) received. Access granted on 8/6/21. Plaintiff's name was modified on this case to match the name on her PACER account. The plaintiff's name on the docket sheet now reflects Susanne R. Hurd with an alias of Susanne Becker. (JLS) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against CenturyLink, City of Volga, Mediacom, and USIC LLC from Scottsbluff County District Court, Case number CI21-596 with receipt number 8061055, in the amount of $ 402; with attached state court pleadings filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Susanne Becker. (LKO) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIACOM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK is a litigant