This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:53:28 (UTC).

Becker v. Delek US Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Becker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Delek US Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr, Alistair Newbern and Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00285

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judges

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J. Becker

Defendant

Delek US Energy, Inc.

Counter Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

Kestrel Field Services, Inc.

Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC

Counter Defendant

Freddy Rojas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap, LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Charles P. Yezbak, III

Attorney at Yezbak Law Offices

P.O. Box 159033, 2021 Richard Jones Road, Suite 310-A

Nashville, TN 37215

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap, LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap, LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan E. Bowdler

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Misty L. Foy

Attorney at Delek US Holdings, Inc.

7102 Commerce Way

Brentwood, TN 37027

Samuel Zurik, III

Attorney at THE KULLMAN FIRM, P.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert P. Lombardi

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Counter Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Jaclyn C. Staple

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP (Houston)

1401 Mckinney, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Gregory Scott Fiddler

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP (Houston)

1401 Mckinney, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Robert Earl Boston

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

William C. Scales, Jr.

Attorney at Gullett, Sanford, Robinson & Martin PLLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37201

Christopher W. Cardwell

Attorney at Gullett, Sanford, Robinson & Martin PLLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37201

Rachel Cowen

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#104

#103

#102

101 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#101

#100

#99

#96

#95

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to be a party plaintiff

#1

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) ORDER granting #101 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/10/2020. (dt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) CERTIFICATE Local Rule 7.01(a)(1) Certificate of Conference filed by Delek US Energy, Inc. re #101 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Appeal of Denial of Motions to Compel Arbitration by Delek US Energy, Inc. and Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC filed by Delek US Energy, Inc.. (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) MEMORANDUM in Support of #101 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Appeal of Denial of Motions to Compel Arbitration by Delek US Energy, Inc. and Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC filed by Delek US Energy, Inc. . (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Appeal of Denial of Motions to Compel Arbitration by Delek US Energy, Inc. and Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC by Delek US Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) USCA Case Number 20-6258 for #96 Notice of Appeal filed by Delek US Energy, Inc.. (Sharday S. Swain - Case Manager) (bs) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) USCA Case Number 20-6255 for #95 Notice of Appeal filed by by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Sharday S. Swain - Case Manager) (bs) Modified on 11/4/2020 (bs). (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) USCA Case Number 20-6252 for #91 Notice of Appeal filed by by Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Sharday S. Swain- Case Manager) (bs) Modified on 11/4/2020 (bs). (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ORDER granting #92 Intervenor-Defendant Kestrel Field Services, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/3/2020. (vh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #87 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,, by Delek US Energy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0650-3248499. (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #87 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,, by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0650-3247124. (Scales, William) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Andrew W. Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3132626) by Michael J. Becker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yezbak, Charles) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Michael J. Becker of Filing One Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rojas Consent)(Yezbak, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Newbern. This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/6/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (hb). (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael A. Josephson, Andrew W. Dunlap and Richard J. Burch: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/23/2020. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Charles P. Yezbak, III. TX State Bar status verified as active for Michael A. Josephson, Andrew W. Dunlap and Richard J. Burch. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued as to Delek US Energy, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Delek US Energy, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3116957), filed by Michael J. Becker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to be a party plaintiff, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delek US Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kestrel Field Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Earl Boston