This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2021 at 10:48:08 (UTC).

Beck v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Beck filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02941

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Beck

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Teva Women's Health, LLC

Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.

The Cooper Companies, Inc.

CooperSurgical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William H. Barfield

Attorney at McDonald Worley P.C.

1770 St. James Place, Ste 100

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#3

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING SEPTEMBER 21, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING. It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) The monthly status conference will be conducted remotely via Zoom, and shall begin at 9:00 am EDT on September 21, 2021. (2) The hearing on Defendants' 89 Motion to Dismiss shall be conducted in person and remotely via Zoom. The hearing shall begin immediately following the monthly status conference. (3) Only essential attorneys involved in the briefing and arguments for the Motion to Dismiss or with an active role in the September status conference may be present in court on September 21, 2021. All others should attend virtually via Zoom. Zoom link: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606260573 Meeting ID: 160 626 0573 Passcode: 123456 Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 (New York) +1 551 285 1373 +1 669 216 1590 (San Jose) Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/15/2021. (Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.) (cmd) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#20

(#3) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Status Conference held on 8/23/2021. The Court held its monthly status conference. The parties are directed to file a proposed scheduling order for the September 21st status conference and motion hearing two weeks prior to the hearing. See transcript for details. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(tcc) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. (rjc) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jill Beck. Direct File MDL- USDC Western District of Texas (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11127004) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING SEPTEMBER 21, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING. It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) The monthly status conference will be conducted remotely via Zoom, and shall begin at 9:00 am EDT on September 21, 2021. (2) The hearing on Defendants' 89 Motion to Dismiss shall be conducted in person and remotely via Zoom. The hearing shall begin immediately following the monthly status conference. (3) Only essential attorneys involved in the briefing and arguments for the Motion to Dismiss or with an active role in the September status conference may be present in court on September 21, 2021. All others should attend virtually via Zoom. Zoom link: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606260573 Meeting ID: 160 626 0573 Passcode: 123456 Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 (New York) +1 551 285 1373 +1 669 216 1590 (San Jose) Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/15/2021. (Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.) (cmd) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Status Conference held on 8/23/2021. The Court held its monthly status conference. The parties are directed to file a proposed scheduling order for the September 21st status conference and motion hearing two weeks prior to the hearing. See transcript for details. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(tcc) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (rjc) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. (rjc) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jill Beck. Direct File MDL- USDC Western District of Texas (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11127004) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cooper Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Women's Health, LLC is a litigant