This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 07:34:54 (UTC).

Beck v. International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Beck filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against International Recovery Partners Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01091

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Beck

Defendant

International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael S. Agruss

Attorney at Agruss Law Firm, LLC

4809 N Ravenswood Ave., Ste. 419

Chicago, IL 60640

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Affidavit

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC filed by Kelly Beck (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) SUMMONS returned executed; International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Summons

#6

(#6) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC (ems) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC (ems) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC (ems) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS returned executed; International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC (ems) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kelly Beck in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4743830 (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC filed by Kelly Beck (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less