This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2021 at 09:18:14 (UTC).

Beck et al v. Mitchell et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Beck filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Mitchell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01280

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kimberly Beck

Travis Lorentz

Defendants

Robert John Mitchell

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon L Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy, Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Beck, Travis Lorentz. Robert John Mitchell served on 1/9/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Beck, Travis Lorentz. United States of America served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert John Mitchell, United States of America ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kimberly Beck, Travis Lorentz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Beck, Travis Lorentz. Robert John Mitchell served on 1/9/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Beck, Travis Lorentz. United States of America served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7448041 re #1 Complaint, filed by Travis Lorentz, Kimberly Beck (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert John Mitchell, United States of America ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kimberly Beck, Travis Lorentz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon L. Kennedy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. Flores

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy