This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 09:00:08 (UTC).

Becicka v. Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Becicka filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sun Life Financial U S Services Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Becicka

Defendants

Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc.

Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Wagner

Attorney at John C Wagner Law Office PC

600 39Th Avenue, Po Box 262

Amana, IA 52203

Defendant Attorneys

Jesse Dill

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

1243 North 10Th Street, Suite 200

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Mark E Schmidtke

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

56 S. Washington St., Suite 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER Setting Hearing. Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/5/2022. (des) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#14

(#14) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan -Joint by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Plaintiff has until May 17, 2022, to file his resistance to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/21/2022. (kms) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#12

(#12) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension DL File Resistance by Plaintiff Mark Becicka. (Wagner, John) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#11

(#11) BRIEF in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc Responses due by 4/26/2022 (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark E. Schmidtke ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3643244) by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead: Defendant has until April 12, 2022, to file an answer to the complaint or a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/15/2022. (kms) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) UNRESISTED, EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (Dill, Jesse) Modified text on 3/15/2022 (jag) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (jjh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#4

(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please see New Removal Case Packet attached (jag) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#3

(#3) STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Mark Becicka (jag) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk Check Status Deadline due by 4/8/2022. (jag) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit E to Notice of Removal - Notice of Removal in State Court

1 #8

Exhibit D - List of Counsel Appearing in State Court

1 #6

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - State Court Filings

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Group Term Policy

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Setting Hearing. Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/5/2022. (des) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan -Joint by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned as presider to the case (no conflicts found). (skm) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Plaintiff has until May 17, 2022, to file his resistance to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/21/2022. (kms) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension DL File Resistance by Plaintiff Mark Becicka. (Wagner, John) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc Responses due by 4/26/2022 (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark E. Schmidtke on behalf of Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2022. (jag) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark E. Schmidtke ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3643244) by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Schmidtke, Mark) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead: Defendant has until April 12, 2022, to file an answer to the complaint or a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/15/2022. (kms) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNRESISTED, EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (Dill, Jesse) Modified text on 3/15/2022 (jag) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc. (jjh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please see New Removal Case Packet attached (jag) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Mark Becicka (jag) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/30/2022. (jag) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk Check Status Deadline due by 4/8/2022. (jag) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number LACV099243. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3638790), filed by Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Services Company, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 5/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Declaration of Scott Cooley, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Scott Cooley - Group Basic Life Master Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Scott Cooley - Group Basic Life Cert, #4 Exhibit 3 - Group Term Policy, #5 Exhibit 4 - Group Term Cert, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - State Court Filings, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal - Pending Motions, #8 Exhibit D - List of Counsel Appearing in State Court, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal - Notice of Removal in State Court) (Dill, Jesse) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN LIFE FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E. Schmidtke Esquire