This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 09:18:07 (UTC).

Beci v. Turkish Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Beci filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Turkish Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01231

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joris Beci

Defendant

Turkish Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda F. Fedrizzi

Attorney at Law Offices of Linda F. Fedrizzi

25-84 Steinway Street

Astoria, NY 11103

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Carlsen

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference plaintiff by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Turkish Airlines, Inc. (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#9

(#9) Letter by Turkish Airlines, Inc. (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

8 #1

Rule 7.1 Statement

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 4/20/2020 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendant a complete set of medical authorizations and HIPAA releases together with the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet. Re #1 Complaint by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Entered: 03/05/2020) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

No Description Available

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Joris Beci against Turkish Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12495930 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) Modified on 3/9/2020 (Barrett, C). (Entered: 03/05/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketORDER: Plaintiff, with defendant's consent, requests an adjournment of the May 5, 2020 conference. The request is granted. The Court adjourns the conference until May 21, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by May 14, 2020. Plaintiff shall execute releases for all medical and/or mental health treatment related to this incident to defendant's counsel by May 14, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/29/2020. (Panjini, Madhura) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference plaintiff by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference by telephone in plaintiff's case on May 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 11:00 a.m. on May 5, 2020. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by April 28, 2020. As this is a personal injury case, plaintiff shall execute releases for all medical and/or mental health treatment related to this incident to defendant's counsel by April 28, 2020. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/10/2020. (Panjini, Madhura) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Turkish Airlines, Inc. (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter by Turkish Airlines, Inc. (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearing: Initial Status Conference previously set for 4/20/2020 is reset to 4/21/2020 at 12:00 pm and will be held by telephone. The parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877# to participate in the call and are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #7 and shall ECF file a completed case management prior to the conference. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 4/20/2020 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendant a complete set of medical authorizations and HIPAA releases together with the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet. Re #1 Complaint by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Entered: 03/05/2020) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. Civil Cover Sheet. Re #1 Complaint by Joris Beci. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fedrizzi, Linda) (Entered: 03/05/2020) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Joris Beci against Turkish Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12495930 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Joris Beci. (Fedrizzi, Linda) Modified on 3/9/2020 (Barrett, C). (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less