This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2019 at 07:56:08 (UTC).

Becerra v. Schultz

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Becerra filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Schultz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerardo Becerra

Defendant

Vanessa Schultz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander F Freeburg

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Katherine Brown

Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse

Michael T Lowe

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Docket Sheet

#3

#2

1 #5

Consent Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Demand for Jury Trial

1 #1

State Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Motions filing deadline 4/6/2020. Motion response deadline 4/20/2020. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 5/1/2020 08:15 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Other Fact Witness Deadline 2/21/2020 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 12/23/2019. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 1/24/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Stipulation Deadline 5/12/2020. Motion in Limine deadline 5/12/2020. Motions in Limine Response Deadline 5/19/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2020 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Jury Trial (4 Days/Stacked #1) set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Michael T Lowe. Receipt CHY031270. (Court Staff, sjk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Michael T. Lowe for Vanessa Schultz by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael T. Lowe to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Vanessa Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Defendant's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Vanessa Schultz. (Brown, Mary) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. The removing party shall immediately file with the clerk of the district court, a copy of the notice of removal. In the event a hearing is pending in district court when the notice of removal is filed with the clerk of the district court, the removing party shall immediately notify the district court judge of the removal of this action. The removing party shall file with the Clerk of this Court copies of all records and proceedings, together with a copy of the state court docket sheet in the district court, within ten (10) days after receipt of this Order. Copy of Order provided to clerk of the district court via US Mail. (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Compliance with USDCLR 81.1 by Defendant Vanessa Schultz (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed 5/9/2019 by Gerardo Becerra (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth District Court, Teton County, 17976 filed by Vanessa Schultz (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #CHY031069) (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less