This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2020 at 08:53:17 (UTC).

Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. v. Diversified Logistic Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Beazley Insurance Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Diversified Logistic Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04154

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.

Defendant

Diversified Logistic Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew D Kehagiaras

Attorney at Roberts and Kehagiaras LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 2350

Long Beach, CA 90831

David T Maloof

Attorney at Maloof and Browne LLC

411 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite 190

Rye, NY 10580

Kipp C Leland

Attorney at Maloof and Browne LLC

411 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite 190

Rye, NY 10580

Defendant Attorney

Frank Xavier Dipolito

Attorney at Swain and Dipolito LLP

879 West 190Th Street Suite 305

Gardena, CA 90248-4223

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Maloof, David) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

16 #1

Statement of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Consenting to Proceed before Magistrate Judge re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge)(Maloof, David) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 10/19/2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Diversified Logistic Services, Inc., identifying Granite State Insurance Company, Security National Insurance Company, Diversified Logistic Services, Beazley Insurance Company. (Dipolito, Frank) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Diversified Logistic Services, Inc..(Attorney Frank Xavier Dipolito added to party Diversified Logistic Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dipolito, Frank) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kipp C. Leland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. and designating Andrew D. Kehagiaras as local counsel #10 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David T. Maloof to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. and designating Andrew D. Kehagiaras as local counsel #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kipp C. Leland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26464447) filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David T. Maloof to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26449594) filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Diversified Logistic Services, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc., identifying SolAero Technologies Corp.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26356144 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Maloof, David) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Consenting to Proceed before Magistrate Judge re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge)(Maloof, David) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 10/19/2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Diversified Logistic Services, Inc., identifying Granite State Insurance Company, Security National Insurance Company, Diversified Logistic Services, Beazley Insurance Company. (Dipolito, Frank) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Diversified Logistic Services, Inc..(Attorney Frank Xavier Dipolito added to party Diversified Logistic Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dipolito, Frank) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kipp C. Leland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. and designating Andrew D. Kehagiaras as local counsel #10 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David T. Maloof to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. and designating Andrew D. Kehagiaras as local counsel #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kipp C. Leland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26464447) filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David T. Maloof to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26449594) filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Diversified Logistic Services, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc., identifying SolAero Technologies Corp.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26356144 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David T Maloof

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kipp C Leland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D Kehagiaras