Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2020 at 07:12:59 (UTC).

Beaulieu v. Foster et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Beaulieu filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Foster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02117

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thaddeus Joseph Beaulieu

Aurora, IL 60505

Defendants

Pete Hardy

Stephanie Sleister

Justin Harrison

Ashford University, LLC

Morris Herbert

Bill Foster

Chicago Vocational Rehab Office

Irvine Pasquier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole R Mirjanich, R

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Lisa T Scruggs

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Sarah Clouse

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives Office of General Counsel

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Todd Barry Tatelman

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ashford University, LLC, Justin Harrison by Nicole Mirjanich (Mirjanich, Nicole) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ashford University, LLC, Justin Harrison by Lisa T. Scruggs (Scruggs, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Defendant Bill Foster to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bill Foster (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bill Foster by Todd Barry Tatelman (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bill Foster by Sarah Clouse (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Kane County Sixteenth Judicial Circuit Court, case number (20-L-105) filed by Bill Foster U.S. Representative for the 11th district of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet)(Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ashford University, LLC, Justin Harrison by Nicole Mirjanich (Mirjanich, Nicole) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ashford University, LLC, Justin Harrison by Lisa T. Scruggs (Scruggs, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Defendant Bill Foster to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bill Foster (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bill Foster by Todd Barry Tatelman (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bill Foster by Sarah Clouse (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Kane County Sixteenth Judicial Circuit Court, case number (20-L-105) filed by Bill Foster U.S. Representative for the 11th district of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet)(Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashford University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Edith Clouse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Barry Tatelman Esq.