This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2020 at 08:55:49 (UTC).

Beasley v. North American Lighting Inc

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Beasley filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against North American Lighting Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Liles C Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01048

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liles C Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kana Beasley

Defendant

North American Lighting Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis Allen McCormick

Defendant Attorneys

Tammy L Baker

Yvonne Norris Maddalena

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/25/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Lighting Inc. filed by North American Lighting Inc (Baker, Tammy) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by North American Lighting Inc.(Baker, Tammy) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Norris Maddalena on behalf of North American Lighting Inc (Maddalena, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Lighting Inc from District Court of Colbert County, Alabama, WITH JURY DEMAND case number 20-DV-2020-90090 filed by North American Lighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/25/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3639826 (B4601107449). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Lighting Inc from District Court of Colbert County, Alabama, WITH JURY DEMAND case number 20-DV-2020-90090 filed by North American Lighting Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AHI). (Baker, Tammy) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Lighting Inc. filed by North American Lighting Inc (Baker, Tammy) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by North American Lighting Inc.(Baker, Tammy) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Norris Maddalena on behalf of North American Lighting Inc (Maddalena, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Lighting Inc from District Court of Colbert County, Alabama, WITH JURY DEMAND case number 20-DV-2020-90090 filed by North American Lighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less