This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 07:45:19 (UTC).

Beasley v. Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Beasley filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00539

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellen Beasley

Defendants

Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE)

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Actavis Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald J. Morrison

Attorney at Kelleher + Holland, LLC

32 North West Street

Waukegan, IL 60085

Defendant Attorney

Michael Joseph Suffern

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

500 West Madison, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022L000833) filed by Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Actavis Pharma, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19106249. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Process and Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Filing

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

2 #1

Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Actavis Pharma, Inc. by Michael Joseph Suffern (Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis Pharma, Inc. (Suffern, Michael) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.) Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/1/2022 (kl, ). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE) (Suffern, Michael) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.) Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/1/2022 (kl, ). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#6

(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (kl, ) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION regarding notice of removal, #1 Stipulation of Remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois (Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting Stipulation of Remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/9/2022. Mailed notice (jh, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 2/9/2022 and Remand Letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (jh, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 2/9/2022 and Remand Letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (jh, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting Stipulation of Remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/9/2022. Mailed notice (jh, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION regarding notice of removal, #1 Stipulation of Remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois (Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (kl, ) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE) (Suffern, Michael) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.) Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/1/2022 (kl, ). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis Pharma, Inc. (Suffern, Michael) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.) Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/1/2022 (kl, ). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Actavis Pharma, Inc. by Michael Joseph Suffern (Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022L000833) filed by Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Actavis Pharma, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19106249. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(Suffern, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Pharma, Inc. is a litigant