This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 09:57:59 (UTC).

Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. v. Northern Clearing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Beasley Forrest Products, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Northern Clearing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beasley Forrest Products, Inc.

Defendant

Northern Clearing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee M. Gillis, Jr

Attorney at James, Bates, Brannan, Groover, LLP

231 Riverside Drive

Macon, GA 31201

Bruce Daniel Dubberly, IV

Attorney at James, Bates, Brannan, Groover, LLP

231 Riverside Drive

Macon, GA 31201

Defendant Attorney

Theresa Davis Beaton

Attorney at Roberts Tate, LLC

2487 Demere Rd, Suite 400, P O Box 21828

Saint Simons Island, GA 31522

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 07/01/2020. (MG) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand by Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Jeff Davis County, #16 Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay all discovery deadlines in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/15/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

16 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Vernon

#16

(#16) Brief in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Jeff Davis County filed by Northern Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Vernon)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#12

MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support Thereof. (ca) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#8

(#16) Brief in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Jeff Davis County filed by Northern Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Vernon)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Daniel Dubberly, IV on behalf of Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by Northern Clearing, Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2020. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/13/20. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#2

(#2) REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re: #1 Notice of Removal. Plaintiff's counsel intending to appear in the referenced matter must enter a notice of appearance or a motion for admission pro hac vice no later than ten days after the issuance of this notice. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

1 #4

Notice to Superior Court of Removal of Case

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#2) REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re: #1 Notice of Removal. Plaintiff's counsel intending to appear in the referenced matter must enter a notice of appearance or a motion for admission pro hac vice no later than ten days after the issuance of this notice. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 07/01/2020. (MG) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand by Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Jeff Davis County, #16 Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay all discovery deadlines in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/15/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Brief in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Jeff Davis County filed by Northern Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Vernon)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof by Northern Clearing, Inc.. Responses due by 6/26/2020. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave of Absence by Theresa D. Beaton for the dates of: July 20, 2020 through and including July 27, 2020; August 26, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020; September 7, 2020 through and including September 8, 2020; September 23, 2020 through and including September 28, 2020; November 23, 2020 through and including November 30, 2020; and December 28, 2020 through and including January 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 11, 2020. (edd) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Northern Clearing, Inc. (ca) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Northern Clearing, Inc. for dates of : July 20-27, 2020; August 26-September 1, 2020; September 7-8, 2020; September 23-28, 2020; November 23-30, 2020; and December 28, 2020-January 4, 2021 by Northern Clearing, Inc.. Responses due by 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support Thereof. (ca) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Northern Clearing, Inc., filed by Beasley Forrest Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit ROFR Agreement, #4 Exhibit Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION to Remand to State Court Superior Court of Jeff Davis County by Beasley Forrest Products, Inc.. Responses due by 6/15/2020. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Northern Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beaton, Theresa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2020: #2 Corrected PDF) (ca). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Daniel Dubberly, IV on behalf of Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Daniel Dubberly, IV on behalf of Beasley Forrest Products, Inc. (Dubberly, Bruce) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by Northern Clearing, Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2020. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/13/20. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Northern Clearing, Inc. answer due 5/20/2013. Notice of Appearance or Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice due by 5/23/2020. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re: #1 Notice of Removal. Plaintiff's counsel intending to appear in the referenced matter must enter a notice of appearance or a motion for admission pro hac vice no later than ten days after the issuance of this notice. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northern Clearing, Inc. from Superior Court of Jeff Davis County, case number SUV2020000072. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGASDC-2839954) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint filed in Superior Court, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration)(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice to Superior Court of Removal of Case) (slt). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE M GILLIS, JR