This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 07:41:39 (UTC).

Beard v. Town of Topsail Beach,et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Beard filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Town of Topsail Beach. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenny G. Beard

Defendants

Town of Topsail Beach

Town of Topsail Beach Police Department

Jacob Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher James Anglin

Attorney at Anglin Law Firm, PLLC

3824 Barrett Dr., Suite 301

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorney

Clay Allen Collier

Attorney at Crossley McIntosh Collier Hanley & Edes, PLLC

5002 Randall Parkway

Wilmington, NC 28403

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jenny G. Beard (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#17

(#17) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher James Anglin on behalf of Jenny G. Beard. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#16

(#16) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Town of Topsail Beach. Town of Topsail Beach waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#15

(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Town of Topsail Beach Police Department. Town of Topsail Beach Police Department waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Jacob Allen. Jacob Allen waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#13

(#13) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #16 ** Notice filed by Town of Topsail Beach Waiver of Service of Summons. (Collier, Clay) Modified on 5/20/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#12

(#12) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #15 ** Notice filed by Town of Topsail Beach Police Department Waiver of Service of Summons. (Collier, Clay) Modified on 5/20/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#11

(#11) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #14 ** Notice filed by Jacob Allen Waiver of Service of Summons. (Collier, Clay) Modified on 5/20/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Town of Topsail Beach (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jacob Allen (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance: Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the Notice of Appearance prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#2

Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance: Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the Notice of Appearance prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C- Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B- Complaint, Amended Complaint and Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A- Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Index Index of Exhibits

#1

(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Christopher Anglin of Anglin Law Firm at PO Box 91746, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on May 14, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel regarding: #17 Notice of Appearance. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating contact information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jenny G. Beard (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher James Anglin on behalf of Jenny G. Beard. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Town of Topsail Beach. Town of Topsail Beach waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Town of Topsail Beach Police Department. Town of Topsail Beach Police Department waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Jacob Allen. Jacob Allen waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #11 Notice - other, #12 Notice - other, #13 Notice - other. Wrong event used. Counsel shall refile using the event "Waiver of Service Executed" found under the Service of Process category. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #16 ** Notice filed by Town of Topsail Beach Waiver of Service of Summons. (Collier, Clay) Modified on 5/20/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #15 ** Notice filed by Town of Topsail Beach Police Department Waiver of Service of Summons. (Collier, Clay) Modified on 5/20/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #14 ** Notice filed by Jacob Allen Waiver of Service of Summons. (Collier, Clay) Modified on 5/20/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice filed by Jacob Allen, Town of Topsail Beach Revised Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Christopher Anglin of Anglin Law Firm at PO Box 91746, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on May 14, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance: Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the Notice of Appearance prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-4] Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet - Counsel's signature line does not comply with Section IV.D.1 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The signature line should read "/s/Clay A. Collier". Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Notice-Other". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Town of Topsail Beach (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jacob Allen (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Town of Topsail Beach. (Collier, Clay) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 5/14/2019) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Jacob Allen. (Collier, Clay) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 5/14/2019) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jacob Allen, Town of Topsail Beach, Town of Topsail Beach Police Department from Sampson County Superior Court, case number 19 cvs 289. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4944731) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B- Complaint, Amended Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit C- Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit) (Collier, Clay) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clay Allen Collier