This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 11:16:17 (UTC).

Beard v. NCB Management Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Beard filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NCB Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Anthony E. Porcelli. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00865

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Beard

Defendant

NCB Management Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan James Geiger

Attorney at Seraph Legal, P.A.

1614 N 19Th St

Tampa, FL 33605-5236

Bridget Lynn Scarangella

Attorney at Seraph Legal, P.A.

1614 North 19Th Street, 33605

Tampa, FL 33605

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NCB Management Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19449395) filed by Jason Beard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Scarangella, Bridget) Modified on 4/12/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 04/12/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to NCB Management Services, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 4/15/2022 by Jason Beard as to NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jason Beard. Related case(s): No (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jason Beard. (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bridget Lynn Scarangella on behalf of Jason Beard. Lead Counsel: Bridget L. Scarangella, Esq.. (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER - FAST TRACK. The parties shall mediate no later than AUGUST 4, 2022. The Court appoints Gregory P. Holder as mediator. On or before MAY 20, 2022, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of mediation that states the agreed date and time of mediation. If mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/21/2022. (SRC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of settlement pending by NCB Management Services, Inc. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of Defendant's "Notice of Pending Settlement" (Doc. #12), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/22/2022. (AIH) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of settlement pending by NCB Management Services, Inc. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER - FAST TRACK. The parties shall mediate no later than AUGUST 4, 2022. The Court appoints Gregory P. Holder as mediator. On or before MAY 20, 2022, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of mediation that states the agreed date and time of mediation. If mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/21/2022. (SRC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bridget Lynn Scarangella on behalf of Jason Beard. Lead Counsel: Bridget L. Scarangella, Esq.. (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jason Beard. (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jason Beard. Related case(s): No (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 4/15/2022 by Jason Beard as to NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Scarangella, Bridget) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to NCB Management Services, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-0865-TPB-AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NCB Management Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19449395) filed by Jason Beard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Scarangella, Bridget) Modified on 4/12/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCB Management Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget Lynn Scarangella

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan James Geiger