Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 08:28:23 (UTC).

Beard v. Fink et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Beard filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Fink. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03046

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald E Beard, Jr

Joliet, IL 60434

Defendants

Joshua Fink

Parole Agent's Office

Prisoner Review Board

Matthew Lukow

Ill. Dept. of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION for Hearing or Status Conference... by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/26/2020 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Plaintiff Donald Beard Jr to update contact information to include telephone number. Docket has been updated by Clerk to show telephone # 217 529-4468. (MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald E Beard, Jr. New address is: 2900 Taylor Ave., Apt. 1, Springfield, IL 62703. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) MOTION to Include Evidence of Civil Rights Violation & Harassment, Submitted in Original Complaint by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Accept, Letter to Director and Grievance Ticket Toward Retaliation Prior to 1st Violation Arrest 12/2/19 by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/11/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Include Additional Evidence/Exhibits by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/11/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Assistance to get the Law Library to Comply with Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647-655 7th Circuit 2007 by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 2/27/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Donald E Beard, Jr.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald E Beard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Hearing or Status Conference... by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/26/2020 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Plaintiff Donald Beard Jr to update contact information to include telephone number. Docket has been updated by Clerk to show telephone # 217 529-4468. (MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald E Beard, Jr. New address is: 2900 Taylor Ave., Apt. 1, Springfield, IL 62703. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Include Evidence of Civil Rights Violation & Harassment, Submitted in Original Complaint by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald E Beard, Jr. New address is: 2900 Taylor Ave., Apt. 1, Springfield, IL 62703. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $400, receipt number 14626036395 (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Accept, Letter to Director and Grievance Ticket Toward Retaliation Prior to 1st Violation Arrest 12/2/19 by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/11/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Include Additional Evidence/Exhibits by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/11/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/25/2020. Plaintiff has filed #3 , a petition to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"). Plaintiff discloses, however, that he has $8,000 in a bank account in his name. #3 is DENIED as plaintiff clearly has the funds to pay the $400 filing fee. Plaintiff will have 30 days in which to do so. The failure to pay the filing fee will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Assistance to get the Law Library to Comply with Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647-655 7th Circuit 2007 by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Donald E Beard, Jr. Responses due by 2/27/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Donald E Beard, Jr (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Donald E Beard, Jr.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald E Beard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prisoner Review Board is a litigant