This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2020 at 18:02:21 (UTC).

Bean v. Wayne Farms LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Bean filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Wayne Farms LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee P. Rudofsky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00798

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mistie Bean

Defendant

Wayne Farms LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr.

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm PLLC

One Financial Center - Suite 411, 650 South Shackleford

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm PLLC

One Financial Center - Suite 411, 650 South Shackleford

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Lee Herrington

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Regions Center, Suite 2000, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3522

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/19/2020 and Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/30/2020. (hml) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wayne Farms LLC.(Herrington, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lee Herrington on behalf of Wayne Farms LLC (Herrington, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wayne Farms LLC filed by Mistie Bean. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077880.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/19/2020 and Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/30/2020. (hml) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wayne Farms LLC.(Herrington, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lee Herrington on behalf of Wayne Farms LLC (Herrington, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wayne Farms LLC filed by Mistie Bean. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077880.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wayne Farms LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Sanford