This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2020 at 08:23:20 (UTC).

Beachum v. Saks Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Beachum filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Saks Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and LaShann DeArcy Hall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01769

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anja Beachum

Defendants

Louis Vuitton USA Inc.

Prada USA Corp.

Brunello Cucinelli USA, Inc.

Saks Incorporated

Saks & Company LLC

Gucci America, Inc.

Fendi North America, Inc.

Loro Piana & C. Inc.

Saks Fifth Avenue LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Daniel Radice

Attorney at Radice Law Firm, PC

34 Sunset Blvd

Beach Haven, NJ 08008

 

Court Documents

#5

#4

#3

2 #8

Brunello summons

2 #7

Fendi summons

2 #6

Gucci summons

2 #5

Saks Fifth summons

2 #4

Loro summons

2 #3

Louis V. summons

2 #2

Prada summons

2 #1

Saks Co. summons

#2

1 #6

Proposed Summons Louis Vuitton USA Inc.

1 #5

Proposed Summons Loro Piana & C. Inc.

1 #4

Proposed Summons Gucci America, Inc.

1 #3

Proposed Summons Fendi North America, Inc.

1 #2

Proposed Summons Brunello Cuccinelli, USA, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketORDER: On May 6, 2020, Magistrate Judge Orenstein entered a stipulation signed by all parties in Giordano et al. v. Saks Incorporated et al. (20-cv-833) that set a unified schedule for Plaintiffs to file a consolidated complaint that incorporates this action, for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs consolidated complaint, and for the parties to file and respond to any other pre-motion conference requests. See 20-cv-833, ECF No. 45. The parties stipulate to closing this case and to amend the caption of the complaint in 20-cv-833 as indicated in paragraph 2 of the stipulation. In light of that stipulation, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 5/6/2020. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Saks Co. summons, #2 Prada summons, #3 Louis V. summons, #4 Loro summons, #5 Saks Fifth summons, #6 Gucci summons, #7 Fendi summons, #8 Brunello summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12663208 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Anja Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Brunello Cuccinelli, USA, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Fendi North America, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Gucci America, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Loro Piana & C. Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Louis Vuitton USA Inc., #7 Proposed Summons Prada USA Corp., #8 Proposed Summons Saks & Company LLC, #9 Proposed Summons Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, #10 Proposed Summons Saks Incorporated) (Radice, John) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brunello Cuccinelli, USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Loro Piana & C. Inc. is a litigant