This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 07:33:25 (UTC).

Beachum

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Beachum was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gregory W. Beachum

In Re

2015 22' Robalo 226 Cayman vessel, FL Registration No. FL3662PT, Its engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in a cause of exoneration from or limitation of liability

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David F. Pope

Attorney at Banker Lopez Gassler (Tampa)

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602-5241

Eric C. Thiel

Attorney at Banker Lopez Gassler (Tampa)

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602-5241

 

Court Documents

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order Monition and Injunction

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Gregory W. Beachum. (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing Monition and Injunction by Gregory W. Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing of Monition and Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Monition and Injunction)(Pope, David) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#6

(#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#11

(#11) MONITION AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/22/2019. (DMP) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Claimants of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Gregory W. Beachum (CTR) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MONITION by Deputy Clerk as to 2015 22' Robalo 226 Cayman vessel, FL Registration No. FL3662PT, Its engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in a cause of exoneration from or limitation of liability re #11 Preliminary Injunction (CTR) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gregory W. Beachum. Related case(s): no (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055209 ) filed by Gregory W. Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#12

(#12) AMENDED document by Gregory W. Beachum. Amended Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 motion for order approving ad interim stipulation and issuing monition and injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/21/2019. (DMP) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION by Gregory W. Beachum for costs. (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing of Mon

#2

(#2) AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR COSTS AND VALUE by Gregory W. Beachum. (CTR) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF MONITION by Deputy Clerk as to 2015 22' Robalo 226 Cayman vessel, FL Registration No. FL3662PT, Its engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in a cause of exoneration from or limitation of liability re #11 Preliminary Injunction (CTR) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED document by Gregory W. Beachum. Amended Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MONITION AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/22/2019. (DMP) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION by Gregory W. Beachum for costs. (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #4 motion for order approving ad interim stipulation and issuing monition and injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/21/2019. (DMP) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gregory W. Beachum. Related case(s): no (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Gregory W. Beachum. (Pope, David) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing Monition and Injunction by Gregory W. Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing of Monition and Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Monition and Injunction)(Pope, David) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to Claimants of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Gregory W. Beachum (CTR) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR COSTS AND VALUE by Gregory W. Beachum. (CTR) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055209 ) filed by Gregory W. Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less