This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:57:24 (UTC).

Beach v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Beach filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon, Donald M. Middlebrooks and William Matthewman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80806

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

Referral Judges

Dave Lee Brannon

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Beach

Defendants

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph R Johnson

Attorney at Babbitt & Johnson, P.A.

1641 Worthington Road, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER CLOSING CASE. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey Beach (Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER CLOSING CASE. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey Beach (Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon no longer assigned to case. (yar) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14654410, filed by John G Sheldon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Robert Johnson