This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:18:39 (UTC).

BE Labs, Inc. v. ViaSat, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 BE Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ViaSat, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01396

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BE Labs, Inc.

Defendant

ViaSat, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant Attorney

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BE Labs, Inc.. ViaSat, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Viasat, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 21, 2021 - filed by ViaSat, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Viasat, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 21, 2021 filed by ViaSat, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: ViaSat, Inc. answer due 12/21/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/27/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Viasat, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 21, 2021 - filed by ViaSat, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BE Labs, Inc.. ViaSat, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01383-CFC, 1:21-cv-01386-CFC, 1:21-cv-01387-CFC, 1:21-cv-01393-CFC, 1:21-cv-01396-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to ViaSat, Inc. on 9/30/2021. (mal) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,827,581 ;9,344,183. (mal) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against ViaSat, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3710982.) - filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where BE Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P. Egan