This case was last updated from PACER on 08/08/2021 at 08:55:29 (UTC).

BE Labs, Inc. v. Fujitsu Limited

Case Summary

On June 9, 2021, BE Labs, Inc. (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Fujitsu Limited (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory and compensatory relief, along with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest and costs, for the alleged infringement patented technology relating to Wireless Multimedia system owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed the complaint for the Defendant’s alleged infringement of United States Patent Nos. 7,827,581 (the ’581 Patent) entitled “Wireless multimedia system”; and 9,344,183 (the ’183 Patent) entitled “Wireless multimedia system”, (together, the “Patents-in-Suit”).

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the Patents-in-suit in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the Patents-in-suit also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary Patents-in-suit Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the Patents-in-suit have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary Patents-in-suit Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out two claims for relief. The first claim is for the alleged infringement of ‘581 Patent. The second claim is for the alleged infringement of ‘183 Patent. The Plaintiff alleged that at least since being served by this Complaint and corresponding claim charts, Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the Patents-in-suit, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the Patents-in-suit.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to adjudicate that the Patents-in-suit are valid and enforceable and Defendant has infringed directly and indirectly one or more claims of the Patents-in-suit; order an accounting of all damages not presented at trial; award Plaintiff all appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant's continuing or future infringement, including pre- or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284; declare this case to be exceptional within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285; and award Plaintiff its reasonable attorney’s fees against Defendant that it incurs in prosecuting this action and award costs, and expenses that it incurs in prosecuting this action.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

 



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BE Labs, Inc.

Defendant

Fujitsu Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant Attorneys

Jamil N. Alibhai

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201-6659

Winston Oliver Huff

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC

500 N. Akard, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order Granting Extension

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss (Voluntary Dismissal) by BE Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 7/30/2021 to change to motion due to proposed order attached (bw). (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Fujitsu Limited answer due 8/12/2021. (lad) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Fujitsu's response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed by no later than August 12, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Fujitsu Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Alibhai, Jamil) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BE Labs, Inc.. Fujitsu Limited served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders (mc5) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Limited. (mc5) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mc5) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BE Labs, Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of BE Labs, Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14891142), filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fujitsu Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where BE Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff