This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2021 at 09:29:23 (UTC).

Be Labs, Inc. v. Cox Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Be Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cox Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01383

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Be Labs, Inc.

Defendant

Cox Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Be Labs, Inc.. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Be Labs, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Cox Communications, Inc. answer due 1/10/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/19/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Be Labs, Inc.. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Be Labs, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Cox Communications, Inc. answer due 11/26/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/22/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Be Labs, Inc.. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Be Labs, Inc.. Cox Communications, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01383-CFC, 1:21-cv-01386-CFC, 1:21-cv-01387-CFC, 1:21-cv-01393-CFC, 1:21-cv-01396-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cox Communications, Inc. on 9/29/2021. (nmg) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Be Labs, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,827,581; 9,344,183. (nmg) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Cox Communications, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3710109.) - filed by Be Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COX COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where BE Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin