This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2021 at 08:12:45 (UTC).

BE Labs, Inc. v. BRK Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 BE Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BRK Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BE Labs, Inc.

Defendant

BRK Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Notice

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,827,581 ;9,344,183. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(fms) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CLOSED per D.I. #7 . (fms) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BE Labs, Inc. as to BRK Brands, Inc. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BE Labs, Inc.. BRK Brands, Inc. served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,827,581 ;9,344,183. (mal) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against BRK Brands, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3630523.) - filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRK Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BE Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin