This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2021 at 10:42:00 (UTC).

BE Labs, Inc. v. Arista Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 BE Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arista Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00219

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BE Labs, Inc.

Defendant

Arista Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant Attorneys

Syed K. Fareed

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

98 San Jacinto, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

Jennifer Librach Nall

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P. - Austin

98 San Jacinto Blvd, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 4.2

1 #5

Exhibit 4.1

1 #4

Exhibit 3.2

1 #3

Exhibit 3.1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed K. Fareed on behalf of Arista Networks, Inc.. Attorney Syed K. Fareed added to party Arista Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUTPREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BE Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Arista Networks, Inc. answer due 5/3/2021. (klw) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant Arista Network, Incs Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc.s Complaint. After consideration, the Court finds that the Motion should be GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Arista Networks, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc.s Complaint is extended to May 3, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Arista Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nall, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Librach Nall on behalf of Arista Networks, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Librach Nall added to party Arista Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Nall, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BE Labs, Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of BE Labs, Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14564634), filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3.1, #4 Exhibit 3.2, #5 Exhibit 4.1, #6 Exhibit 4.2, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arista Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BE Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff