This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2020 at 08:50:44 (UTC).

BDK USA, Inc. v. FH Group International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 BDK USA, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against FH Group International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09174

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BDK USA, INC.

Defendants

FH Group International, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Woo Ahn

Attorney at Ahn Ip Law

12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 807

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: MOTION to Dismiss Case filed 11/25/2020 #16 . The document is accepted as filed. Defendant filed NOTICE of Interested Parties on 12/02/2020. (gk) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc., (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

16 #2

Declaration Yanping Fang

16 #1

Memorandum

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Yanping Fang) (Attorney Nicholas Allen Kurtz added to party FH Group International, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#15

(#15) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE STANLEY BLUMENFELD, JR. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See order for specifics). (et) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#14

(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09174 SB(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#12

(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, Inc.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints - Select - Summons Request. Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case number is 2:20cv09174 DDP (JEMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#10

(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BDK USA, Inc.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, Inc.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28414944 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney James Woo Ahn added to party BDK USA, INC.(pty:pla))(Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: MOTION to Dismiss Case filed 11/25/2020 #16 . The document is accepted as filed. Defendant filed NOTICE of Interested Parties on 12/02/2020. (gk) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc., (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Yanping Fang) (Attorney Nicholas Allen Kurtz added to party FH Group International, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE STANLEY BLUMENFELD, JR. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See order for specifics). (et) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09174 SB(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, Inc.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints - Select - Summons Request. Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case number is 2:20cv09174 DDP (JEMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BDK USA, Inc.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, Inc.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, INC., identifying BDK USA, INC.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, INC.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, INC.. (Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28414944 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BDK USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney James Woo Ahn added to party BDK USA, INC.(pty:pla))(Ahn, James) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH Group International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BDK USA INC> is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Allen Kurtz