This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 11:34:08 (UTC).

BDFI, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 BDFI, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Appellant

BDFI, LLC

Appellee

Mokaram-Latif West Loop, Ltd.

Trustee

Allison D. Byman

In Re

2500 West Loop, Inc. f/k/a 2500 West Loop, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Patricia Canales Bell

Benjamin Riley Stephens

Jameson Joseph Watts

Lynn Hamilton Butler

Nicholas David Stepp

Appellee Attorney

Michael J Durrschmidt

Trustee Attorney

Randy W Williams

In Re Attorney

Johnie J Patterson, II

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #2

Proof of Claim

18 #1

Continuation

#18

#17

#16

RESTRICTED

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Amended Notice of Appeal

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Appellant's Brief ( Appellant Brief due by 3/12/2021)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed RESPONSE to #20 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Appellant's Brief filed by Mokaram-Latif West Loop, Ltd.. (Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time To File Appellant's Brief by BDFI, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2021. (Stepp, Nicholas) (Main Document 20 replaced on 2/5/2021) (rwestmoreland, 4). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 1/12/2021, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, Civil Action 2:20-cv-304. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Proof of Claim)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #16 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TRANSCRIPT re: Motion for Stay (Video Conference) held on December 15, 2020 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Penny S. Keller Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2021., filed. (mahenry, ) (Entered: 12/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by BDFI, LLC/Lynn Hamilton Butler for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 12/15/2020 before Judge Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Butler, Lynn) Audio and log notes were electronically uploaded to Judicial Transcribers 12/16/20 at 12:05 pm by FC. Estimated completion of transcript is 12/17/20 and Judicial has also been duly notified via email as well. (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE Of Amended Proposed Order re: #3 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by BDFI, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Patricia) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by BDFI, LLC. (Stephens, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Setting as to #3 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Parties notified. Parties will appear by Zoom. Parties can connect to our courtroom at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1613085787. All parties MUST MUTE their audio if they are not speaking. Parties must be logged into Zoom at least 15 minutes prior to hearing start time. Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #6 Order, , filed by Mokaram-Latif West Loop, Ltd.. (Durrschmidt, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #6 Order, Requiring Response, filed by BDFI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Appellant Certificate of Conference and any proposed order due by 12/15/2020. Any parties opposing #3 Appellant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, to file a response by 12/17/2020.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTIONS to #3 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal , filed by Allison D. Byman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Williams, Randy) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #3 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by BDFI, LLC, filed.(Butler, Lynn) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by BDFI, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bell, Patricia) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order entered on 12/14/2020 of the Bankruptcy Court. On 11/23/2020, BDFI, LLC filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, Civil Action 2:20-cv-304. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less