This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 08:41:35 (UTC).

BCBSM, Inc. et al v. Celgene Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 BCBSM, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Celgene Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02071

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BCBSM, Inc.

Molina Healthcare, Inc.

Health Care Service Corporation

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation

Celgene Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas R Bennerotte

Attorney at Bennerotte & Associates, P.A.

3085 Justice Way, Suite 200

Eagan, MN 55121

Vincent J Moccio

Attorney at Bennerotte & Associates, P.A.

3085 Justice Way, Suite 200

Eagan, MN 55121

Uriel Rabinovitz

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Charles Z Kopel

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

100 Front Street, Ste 520

West Conshohocken, PA 19428

Peter D. St Phillip, Jr

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa L Beane

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South Seventh Street, Ste 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrew M. Luger

Attorney at Jones Day

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Benjamin M Greenblum

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street

Washington, DC 20005

Toni Citera

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Rajeev Muttreja

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey St.

New York, NY 10281

Brian David Hershman

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, Ste 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Colette Connor

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

RESTRICTED

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#24

#8

#7

#6

#5

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #35 Letter to District Judge. The parties' joint request to exceed the word-count limit for briefs regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Each side may use up to 16,000 words for their briefs on Defendants' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/9/2020. (SMD) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits for briefs addressing Defendants' motion to dismiss. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) TRANSCRIPT of Informal Dispute Resolution Hearing (audio digital recording) held on 10/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (18 pages). Transcriber: Renee Rogge. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 11/16/2020. Redaction Request due 11/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021. (RAR) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles Z Kopel for BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, and for Molina Healthcare, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/5/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (Beane, Lisa) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles Kopel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8185590 filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc..(Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #24 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc..(Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter D. St Phillip, Jr for BCBSM, Inc.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Uriel Rabinovitz for BCBSM, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/8/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER on #5 Stipulation,. Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation response due 10/21/2020; Celgene Corporation response due 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/6/2020.(TMA) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Uriel Rabinovitz,. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8117182 filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8117161 filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation,. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. Jointly Signed by BCBSM, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc., and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter D. St. Phillip, Noelle Ruggiero, Uriel Rabinowitz, Thomas Griffith, Todd M. Schneider, Jason Kim, Matthew S. Weiler, Brian D. Hershman, Toni-Ann Citera, Rajeev Muttreja, Benjamin M. Greenblum, Colette T. Connor as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd,4th Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-2071 (SRN/ECW). (MMP) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County, case number 19HA-cv-20-2915 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8097611) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCBSM INC. DBA BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MINNESOTA ON ITS OWN BEHALF AND AS CLAIMS FIDUCIARY ON BEHALF OF THE 3M CONSUMER-DIRECTED PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where CELGENE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION ILLINOIS is a litigant

Latest cases where Bristol-Myers Squibb Company is a litigant