This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 09:42:54 (UTC).

BBC Studios Distribution Ltd v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 BBC Studios Distribution Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06531

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BBC Studios Distribution Ltd

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

SASATEK

SH XIAO

ShanDongDingShiZhiKuGuoJiMaoYiYouXianGongSi

shangqiutengyoushangmaoyouxiangongsi

shanxixingningwangluokejiyouxiangongsi

Shilong Agricultural Technology

ShunHong Ltd

sjkaaf

Skovlys

Smanapa

Spgd store

Stage Manage

struggler

SuLon

Swim Apex

Szytypyl

taianxihuidianzishangwuyouxiangongsi

Taiyuanshi Pinsheng Huacheng Dianzishangwu Ltd

192 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Marcella Deshonda Slay

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 South Wacker Dr. Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: One of the defendants, youl336, has filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint #38 . Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion by 2/17/2022. Defendant youl336 is directed to file a reply to plaintiff's response by 2/28/2022. Telephonic hearing is set for 3/15/2022 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of MOTION by Defendant youl336 to dismiss (Exhibit) (bg, ) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#36

(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/11/2022. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#35

(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic preliminary injunction hearing held on 1/11/2022. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Greer, Burns and Crain, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A telephonic status hearing is set for 3/16/2022 at 8:50 a.m. The following call-in number will be used: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#34

(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#31

(#33) NOTICE by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd re MOTION by Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd for preliminary injunction #31 (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/12/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: One of the defendants, youl336, has filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint #38 . Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion by 2/17/2022. Defendant youl336 is directed to file a reply to plaintiff's response by 2/28/2022. Telephonic hearing is set for 3/15/2022 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of MOTION by Defendant youl336 to dismiss (Exhibit) (bg, ) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: SASATEK, SH XIAO, ShanDongDingShiZhiKuGuoJiMaoYiYouXianGongSi, shangqiutengyoushangmaoyouxiangongsi, shanxixingningwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, Shilong Agricultural Technology, ShunHong Ltd, sjkaaf, Skovlys, Smanapa, Spgd store, Stage Manage, struggler, SuLon, Swim Apex, Szytypyl, taianxihuidianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, Taiyuanshi Pinsheng Huacheng Dianzishangwu Ltd, taoyi, Tenking us, TenngCha_Diret, Tiedaner, tongshanxianletibaihuodian, TongXinQi, TTSTK, tuf wings, Undemand, UNENOW, UsualStooe, UXO party, VGNRUSA, Virceivr, VIVIDUKE, vsdiww, wangchenyang7, wanhuatong, waxuan, WeiGai Trade Co Ltd, Welcomy Direct, Wen Party, WIGEE DIRECT, WINCG, Wishforsweet, Wishliker, Witty Peas, WNQY, WonderGift, Worldoor, Wrilicyoki, Wuhexiankoubeibaihuodian, Wulanlan, xiaohuidebaozangdianpu, XIAOTT(10-18 days delivery time), xiaqiuyangbaihuo, xinqubowenbaihuoshangdian, xuehuapiaopiao, XUNLONGPA, XX Fashion clothing, XXTWYY, Y.Storefront, Yagang, yanjinxianwandanshangmaoyouxiangongsi, YATOTO, yeqingzhu, yeyihua, YINGSHENGSHANGMAOYOUXIANGONGSI, yishuishangmaohang, yiwushipuxuejiaoyuxinxizixunyouxiangongsi, YMMRSK, YONCHE, yong ding qu yue lun xu bai huo dian, Yongdu Trading Co., Ltd., yongyueda, yooukbn, YuCaiMaoYi US, yunchengshiyanhuqugoudanwujinrizadian, YYTM Store, Zehuishangmao, ZFENTSTORE, zhangcunwen2532, zhongshenglaowumaoyi, Zooci, ZQHBDJIN, zuotian, ZZiJing, dandelionl2, denimbi, jiao03, 3cn4646, bbbridge2019, qrly4296, treasure-01_1, wadgngojhui, youl336, AIFashionFamily, Albert Christie, Alexandra Parashos, Amyaa, ananzjj, angelaaaa, AopohaopY, appletree000, arayareina49516551, Ashley Grannell, Autumn Vogelx, Bbpig-eco, bodbyuans, Brianaa, cai xin mr, cairongzhang, Calvinyy, caohaodian, chenliyanshop, cheyingli446, Chris Rogow, Connie Larson, cudongxiufeng, Dahlia Delaney, Danielle Belcher, dawangstore, Deborah Hurwitz, Drew Grimes, duanlingling88, Envy Iteri, ertrg2r15, Farmasanjuda, fghjhkj, fleisneon, Fred Strong, FU GUI Convenience Store, fur0033shop, fuxinhai6759, gancuifanquan, Gengqiu5681, Geoffrey Simms, Ginellon, Global MTshop, Gogo E-Commerce, gongzengyou2592, goodtime123, happydog003, hegenqing, honglin2420, hujinfu, hulls, I6I6I6, idealhereoo, idealhereqq, jiangxiaowen123, jianhanz, Kathryn Jarvisp, leschjimmie, lfrossef, lijia20170725, liudongyang1230, liuxianming fashion, Magtters, mahuyang72781, Moonlit Solutions, msizh, pataaee, patitoughmexaa, Post5566, presenced, providence life, Red brick, Relevoshop, Richard Nelson, Richardaaa, Rita Mata, SAC A DOS, shockoufs, SHZML, slithesbnoosj, somchanbik, Suzannesmgl, SWEET-TT, szcw, SZLW20, tangmingqin520023, tdvmm38shop, tesmeautpgky, thebeautybuy, thrthtrht, tongyangyang123, Toy Story, ToyClubs, TracyAnneaa, trifles, Voyoutang, wangxianhui6688, weiweineiying, wwe7, xaxi888888, Xianshuyuan, xiedakang51342, xubukanglkm, XUCHENGG, yan xiang store, yeling5046, yeoow, zhangjialongshop, zhanglinghao123, zhangnana5696, zhangxiucun, zhaoguotian, Zhopyaoj, zkghcxeky, zohensurn and ZYJ & store added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/11/2022. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic preliminary injunction hearing held on 1/11/2022. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Greer, Burns and Crain, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A telephonic status hearing is set for 3/16/2022 at 8:50 a.m. The following call-in number will be used: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd re MOTION by Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd for preliminary injunction #31 (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff BBC Studios Distribution Ltd Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/12/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by BBC Studios Distribution Ltd; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18942847. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcella Deshonda Slay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaku Begert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin