This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2019 at 07:16:45 (UTC).

BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Mannion and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04842

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven C. Mannion

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendants

BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL

SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLY ANN KRUG

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

BRYAN PAUL COUCH

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (MEGARIOTIS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (KRUG, KELLY) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL, SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9388364), filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sunstar Hospitality, LLC on 3/21/19, filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL served on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL, SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sunstar Hospitality, LLC on 3/21/19, filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL served on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (MEGARIOTIS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL, SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (KRUG, KELLY) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL, SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9388364), filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.