This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:44:37 (UTC).

BAYLISS v. North Broward Hospital District

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 BAYLISS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against North Broward Hospital District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Smith and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-61259

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORETTA BAYLISS

Defendant

North Broward Hospital District

303 Se 17Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis Paul Pfeffer

Attorney at Louis P. Pfeffer P.A.

250 South Central Blvd, Suite 205

Jupiter, FL 33458

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew David Stefany

Attorney at Allen, Norton and Blue, P.A.

324 South Hyde Park Avenu, Suite 225

Tampa, FL 33606

Susan Potter Norton

Attorney at Allen Norton & Blue

121 Majorca Avenue, Suite 300

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#8

(#4) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (sl00) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11657090, filed by North Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit 2. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Stefany, Matthew) Text Modified on 5/20/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#9

(#11) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1. State Court Filings

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle added. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 2. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#5

(#5) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by North Broward Hospital District. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Stefany, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed May 24, 2019 (DE 5) by LORETTA BAYLISS. (Pfeffer, Louis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Striking #6 Response to Motion filed by LORETTA BAYLISS by LORETTA BAYLISS (Pfeffer, Louis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) (STRICKEN PER DE#8)RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by LORETTA BAYLISS. Replies due by 6/12/2019. (Pfeffer, Louis)Text Modified on 6/6/2019 (cqs). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by LORETTA BAYLISS. Replies due by 6/21/2019. (Pfeffer, Louis) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#14

(#14) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by North Broward Hospital District (Stefany, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by North Broward Hospital District. (Stefany, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by North Broward Hospital District (Stefany, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by North Broward Hospital District. (Stefany, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle added. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by LORETTA BAYLISS. Replies due by 6/21/2019. (Pfeffer, Louis) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines as to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint). Responses due by 6/14/2019 per DE 9 Order. (mc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #7 . The Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Striking #6 Response to Motion filed by LORETTA BAYLISS by LORETTA BAYLISS (Pfeffer, Louis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed May 24, 2019 (DE 5) by LORETTA BAYLISS. (Pfeffer, Louis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) (STRICKEN PER DE#8)RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by LORETTA BAYLISS. Replies due by 6/12/2019. (Pfeffer, Louis)Text Modified on 6/6/2019 (cqs). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by North Broward Hospital District. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Stefany, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (sl00) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11657090, filed by North Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit 2. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Stefany, Matthew) Text Modified on 5/20/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.