This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:47:23 (UTC).

Bayer v. Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Bayer filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02864

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Bayer

Defendant

Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis Dunn

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Peter F. Ferracuti

110 E. Main Street

Ottawa, IL 61350

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn Montgomery Moran

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Anderson Charles Franklin

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.c.

150 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law ANSWER to Complaint by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.(Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.'s unopposed motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.'s responsive pleading due on before 6/30/2021. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bayer by Travis Dunn (Dunn, Travis) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE Entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court denies Defendant's motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint #5 without prejudice, because defense counsel has failed to indicate in the title and the body of the motion whether the motion is opposed or unopposed. Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order, "[b]efore filing a motion, the movant's counsel must ask opposing counsel whether there is an objection to the motion. Whether the motion is opposed or unopposed should be so identified in the title and body of the motion." Defendant may file another motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint by 6/9/2021, and in that motion, defense counsel must indicate in the title and the body of the motion whether the motion is opposed or unopposed. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#7

(#7) MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 8/10/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d), the removing party's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. The removing party should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the opposing party has been given notice of removal. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. by Anderson Charles Franklin (Franklin, Anderson) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. by Kathryn Montgomery Moran (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from LaSalle County, case number (2021L000040) filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18293897. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law ANSWER to Complaint by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.(Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.'s unopposed motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.'s responsive pleading due on before 6/30/2021. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bayer by Travis Dunn (Dunn, Travis) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE Entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court denies Defendant's motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint #5 without prejudice, because defense counsel has failed to indicate in the title and the body of the motion whether the motion is opposed or unopposed. Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order, "[b]efore filing a motion, the movant's counsel must ask opposing counsel whether there is an objection to the motion. Whether the motion is opposed or unopposed should be so identified in the title and body of the motion." Defendant may file another motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint by 6/9/2021, and in that motion, defense counsel must indicate in the title and the body of the motion whether the motion is opposed or unopposed. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 8/10/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d), the removing party's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. The removing party should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the opposing party has been given notice of removal. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. by Anderson Charles Franklin (Franklin, Anderson) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. by Kathryn Montgomery Moran (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from LaSalle County, case number (2021L000040) filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18293897. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Moran, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis Dunn