This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2022 at 08:32:46 (UTC).

Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Micro Labs Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Bayer Pharma AG filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Micro Labs Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

Bayer Pharma AG

Bayer AG

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Micro Labs Ltd.

Micro Labs USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Derek James Fahnestock

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Rodger Dallery Smith, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Micro Labs Ltd., Micro Labs USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3796508.) - filed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: on or about 12/30/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attached. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,828,310 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Pharma AG filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Micro Labs Ltd. on 2/7/2022; Micro Labs USA Inc. on 2/7/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. Micro Labs Ltd. served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. Micro Labs USA Inc. served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Micro Labs USA Inc., Micro Labs Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Micro Labs Ltd. for Micro Labs USA, Inc. filed by Micro Labs Limited, Micro Labs USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Civil Action No. 22-165-RGA is consolidated for all purposes, including trial, with Civil Action 21-314-RGA, and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 21-314-RGA. Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 10/28/2022. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 8/5/2022. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/23/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/19/2023, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 2 day Bench Trial is set to start 5/30/2023, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03017-RGA, 1:22-cv-00165-RGA(nms) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Civil Action No. 22-165-RGA is consolidated for all purposes, including trial, with Civil Action 21-314-RGA, and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 21-314-RGA. Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 10/28/2022. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 8/5/2022. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/23/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/19/2023, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 2 day Bench Trial is set to start 5/30/2023, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03017-RGA, 1:22-cv-00165-RGA(nms) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 3/21/2022 (nms). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Micro Labs Ltd. for Micro Labs USA, Inc. filed by Micro Labs Limited, Micro Labs USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Micro Labs USA Inc., Micro Labs Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The Answer filed on 3/7/2022, at D.I. 10 and the Disclosure Statement filed that same day at D.I. 11 have been removed from the docket. This case relates to a pending MDL and therefore all pleading need inclusion of the MDL matter in the caption. Defendant is to refile (both in this case and the MDL) the answer and disclosure statement correcting this deficiency. (nms) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. Micro Labs USA Inc. served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. Micro Labs Ltd. served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSummons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Micro Labs Ltd. and Micro Labs USA Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Micro Labs Ltd. on 2/7/2022; Micro Labs USA Inc. on 2/7/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Pharma AG filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,828,310 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: on or about 12/30/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attached. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Micro Labs Ltd., Micro Labs USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3796508.) - filed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Micro Labs USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer HealthCare LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant