This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2023 at 09:13:41 (UTC).

Municipality of Bayamon et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Municipality of Bayamon filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Exxon Mobil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01550

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan

 

Party Details

Defendants

Exxon Mobil Corporation

5959 Las Colinas Boulevard

Irving, TX 75039

Shell PLC

Chevron Corporation

6001 Bollinger Canyon Road

San Ramon, CA 94583

BP PLC

1 St. James'S Square, London

28 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

4 #5

Exhibit O

4 #4

Exhibit J-N

4 #3

Exhibit I

#4

(#4) STATEMENT RICO filed by Municipality of Aguadilla, Municipality of Aibonito, Municipality of Anasco, Municipality of Barranquitas, Municipality of Bayamon, Municipality of Caguas, Municipality of Cayey, Municipality of Cidra, Municipality of Comerio, Municipality of Lares, Municipality of Las Marias, Municipality of Loiza, Municipality of Moca, Municipality of Morovis, Municipality of Trujillo Alto, Municipality of Vega Baja re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Municipality of Comerio, Municipality of Trujillo Alto, Municipality of Cidra, Municipality of Cayey, Municipality of Loiza, Municipality of Aguadilla, Municipality of Lares, Municipality of Aibonito, Municipality of Caguas, Municipality of Morovis, Municipality of Moca, Municipality of Barranquitas, Municipality of Anasco, Municipality of Las Marias, Municipality of Bayamon, Municipality of Vega Baja. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A-H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J-N, #5 Exhibit O) (Mason, Roy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

1 #19

Summons

1 #15

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Category Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 40-49

1 #5

Exhibit 35-39

1 #4

Exhibit 25-34

1 #3

Exhibit 16-24

1 #2

Exhibit 1-15

1 #1

Exhibit Index

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Signed by Chief Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/14/2022. (ft) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT RICO filed by Municipality of Aguadilla, Municipality of Aibonito, Municipality of Anasco, Municipality of Barranquitas, Municipality of Bayamon, Municipality of Caguas, Municipality of Cayey, Municipality of Cidra, Municipality of Comerio, Municipality of Lares, Municipality of Las Marias, Municipality of Loiza, Municipality of Moca, Municipality of Morovis, Municipality of Trujillo Alto, Municipality of Vega Baja re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Municipality of Comerio, Municipality of Trujillo Alto, Municipality of Cidra, Municipality of Cayey, Municipality of Loiza, Municipality of Aguadilla, Municipality of Lares, Municipality of Aibonito, Municipality of Caguas, Municipality of Morovis, Municipality of Moca, Municipality of Barranquitas, Municipality of Anasco, Municipality of Las Marias, Municipality of Bayamon, Municipality of Vega Baja. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A-H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J-N, #5 Exhibit O) (Mason, Roy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Arch Resources Incorporated, BHP Group Limited, BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Peabody Energy Incorporated, Rio Tinto PLC, Shell PLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7999224.), filed by Anasco, Cayey, Caguas, Bayamon, Moca, Aguadilla, Comerio, Loiza, Trujillo Alto, Cidra, Aibonito, Morovis, Las Marias, Lares, Vega Baja, Barranquitas. Service due by 2/21/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1-15, #3 Exhibit 16-24, #4 Exhibit 25-34, #5 Exhibit 35-39, #6 Exhibit 40-49, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Sheet, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons)(Mason, Roy) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shell is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BP, P.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant