This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2023 at 14:27:24 (UTC).

Bay County, Florida et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Bay County, Florida filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKinsey and Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J FRANK and T KENT WETHERELL II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAY COUNTY FLORIDA

CALHOUN COUNTY FLORIDA

CITY OF NICEVILLE FLORIDA

CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA

CITY OF PENSACOLA FLORIDA

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE FLORIDA

ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER J MOUGEY

Attorney at LEVIN PAPANTONIO RAFFERTY - PENSACOLA FL

316 S Baylen Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Email Request

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 3 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:23cv00185. (jcw) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 3 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:23cv00185. (jcw) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#3) Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of California. (jcw) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-39) re MDL 2996 to Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Email Request) (jcw) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against McKinsey and Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7606727.), filed by City of Tallahassee, Florida, Leon County, Florida, City of Niceville, Florida, Escambia County, Florida, Holmes County, Florida, Santa Rosa County, Florida, Calhoun County, Florida, Gulf County, Florida, Bay County, Florida, City of Panama City, Florida, Jackson County, Florida, City of Pensacola, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less