This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 09:18:11 (UTC).

Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church et al v. Paxton et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Paxton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03081

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee

Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church

Perk You Later, LLC

Drink Houston Better, LLC doing business as Antidote Coffee

Defendants

Chief of Houston PD Art Acevedo

County Attorney Vince Ryan

Presiding Officer Kim Lemaux

Harris County DA Kim Ogg

Webster Acting Chief Pete Bacon

TX Attorney General Ken Paxton

County Sheriff Ed Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Roquemore Taylor

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Ave, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Peter C Canfield

Attorney at Jones Day

1420 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309-3053

Alla Lefkowitz

Attorney at Everytown Law

P.O. Box #4184, 450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Nigar Aftab Shaikh

Attorney at Everytown Law

450 Lexington Ave., P.O. Box 4184

Lexington, NY 10017

Charlotte H Taylor

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Stephen J Petrany

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Ave Nw

Washington, DC 22202

Defendant Attorney

Todd Alan Dickerson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

300 W. 15Th St., 11Th Floor, Mc-019

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kim Lemaux served on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020, filed.(Taylor, William) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ken Paxton served on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020, filed.(Taylor, William) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Dickerson on behalf of Kim Lemaux, Ken Paxton, filed. (Dickerson, Todd) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Peter C Canfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Charlotte Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Peter C. Canfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Charlotte H. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Nigar Aftab Shaikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Nigar Aftab Shaikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perk You Later, LLC, filed.(Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, filed.(Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, filed.(Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25151526) filed by Perk You Later, LLC, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen John Petrany

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alla Lefkowitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Crane Canfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Roquemore Taylor