This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2022 at 07:56:52 (UTC).

Baxley Corporation, LLC et al v. Harden

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Baxley Corporation, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Harden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00503

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Appellants

Baxley Corporation, LLC

Baxley Leasing, LLC

Jonathan Keith

Martha Baxley

Rudolph Baxley

Appellee

Trustee Holmes P. Harden

Interested Parties

Stephanie J. Butler

Brandon Baxley

Commericial Holdings Corporation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

J. Michael Malone

Attorney at Hendren, Redwine & Malone, PLLC

4600 Marriott Dr., Suite 150

Raleigh, NC 27612

Appellee Attorneys

George Mason Oliver

Attorney at The Law Offices of Oliver & Cheek, PLLC

P. O. Box 1548, 405 Middle St.

New Bern, NC 28563

Ciara L. Rogers

Attorney at Oliver Friesen Cheek PLLC

P. O. Box 1548, 405 Middle St.

New Bern, NC 28563

Interested Party Attorney

William P. Janvier

Attorney at Stevens Martin Vaughn & Tadych, PLLC

6300 Creedmoor Road, Suite 170-370

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Appellant's BRIEF by Martha Baxley, Rudolph Baxley, Jonathan Keith. (Malone, J.) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#19

(#19) Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#16

(#16) Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#15

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

14 #6

Bankruptcy Administrator's Exhibit F

14 #5

Trustee's Exhibit E

14 #4

Trustee's Exhibit D

14 #3

Trustee's Exhibit C

14 #2

Trustee's Exhibit B

#8

(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jonathan Keith (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#7

(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Rudolph Baxley (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Martha Baxley (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Baxley Leasing, LLC (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Baxley Corporation, LLC (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Martha Baxley, Rudolph Baxley, Baxley Corporation, LLC, Baxley Leasing, LLC, Jonathan Keith. (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

1 #1

Judge David M. Warren's Order Dated December 7, 2021

#1

(#17) Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Appellant's BRIEF by Martha Baxley, Rudolph Baxley, Jonathan Keith. (Malone, J.) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 1, 2021, before Judge David M. Warren. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Part 2 of Appellee's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Trustee's Exhibit A, #2 Trustee's Exhibit B, #3 Trustee's Exhibit C, #4 Trustee's Exhibit D, #5 Trustee's Exhibit E, #6 Bankruptcy Administrator's Exhibit F) (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Part 1 of Appellee's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1 A-D from Designation, #2 Documents 2 A-L from Designation) (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1-5 from Designation) (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of Holmes P. Harden. (Rogers, Ciara) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by George Mason Oliver on behalf of Holmes P. Harden. (Oliver, George) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jonathan Keith (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Rudolph Baxley (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Martha Baxley (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Baxley Leasing, LLC (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Baxley Corporation, LLC (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Martha Baxley, Rudolph Baxley, Baxley Corporation, LLC, Baxley Leasing, LLC, Jonathan Keith. (Malone, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-00037-5-DMW. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order Dated December 7, 2021) (Donleycott, S.) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baxley is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Janvier