This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:21:00 (UTC).

Bautista v. PR Gramercy Square Condominium et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Bautista filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PR Gramercy Square Condominium. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11093

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVER BAUTISTA

Defendants

PR GRAMERCY SQUARE CONDOMINIUM

CLIPPER EQUITY GP LLC

Clipper Equity LLC

CLIPPER EQUITY NEW YORK LP

GRAMERCY SQUARE CONDOMINIUMS, LLC

Clipper Realty Inc.

Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC

Residential Management Group, LLC d/b/a Douglas Elliman Property Management

Alket Gjeci

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Sarah Goddard

Attorney at Goddard Law PLLC

39 Broadway, Suite 1540

New York, NY 10006

Shaina Claire Wood

Attorney at Goddard Law PLLC

39 Broadway, Suite 1540

New York, NY 10006

Siobhan E. C. Klassen

Attorney at Goddard Law PLLC

39 Broadway, Ste. 1540

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher John Yee Coyne

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1 Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Jeffrey Dean Pollack

Attorney at Mintz & Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Adam Kahan Brody

Attorney at Mintz & Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Shaina Wood dated February 11, 2022 re: #17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jeffrey D. Pollack dated February 2, 2022., #16 LETTER MOTION for Conference to seek leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Coyne dated February 2, 2022. . Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Wood, Shaina) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shaina Claire Wood on behalf of Oliver Bautista..(Wood, Shaina) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#18

(#18) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pre-Motion Letters addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Megan Goddard, Esq. dated February 3, 2022. Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Goddard, Megan) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#17

(#17) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jeffrey D. Pollack dated February 2, 2022. Document filed by Clipper Equity GP LLC, Clipper Equity LLC, Clipper Equity New York LP, Clipper Realty Inc...(Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#16

(#16) LETTER MOTION for Conference to seek leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Coyne dated February 2, 2022. Document filed by Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC, Alket Gjeci, Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium, Residential Management Group, LLC d/b/a Douglas Elliman Property Management..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alket Gjeci..(pc) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#14

(#14) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alket Gjeci, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Goddard, Megan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clipper Equity GP LLC, Clipper Equity LLC, Clipper Equity New York LP, Clipper Realty Inc., Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium, Residential Management Group, LLC d/b/a Douglas Elliman Property Management, Alket Gjeci with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Goddard, Megan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint and for an amendment to the case caption addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Coyne dated January 3, 2022. Document filed by Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC, Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155840/2021..Document filed by Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC, Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/16/2022 by telephone. Plaintiff's and Defendants' counsel present. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by March 2, 2022. If defendant decides to file a motion to dismiss, they shall do so by March 23, 2022. Plaintiff's response is due April 3, 2022. Reply is due April 27, 2022. Plaintiff agrees to dismiss the retaliation claim. (jar) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Shaina Wood dated February 11, 2022 re: #17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jeffrey D. Pollack dated February 2, 2022., #16 LETTER MOTION for Conference to seek leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Coyne dated February 2, 2022. . Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Wood, Shaina) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shaina Claire Wood on behalf of Oliver Bautista..(Wood, Shaina) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Conference, #17 Letter Motion for Conference, #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. A pre-motion conference will be held on February 16, 2022 at 09:30 a.m. by telephone. Plaintiff's response is due February 11, 2022. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, docs. 16, 17, and 18. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pre-Motion Letters addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Megan Goddard, Esq. dated February 3, 2022. Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Goddard, Megan) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jeffrey D. Pollack dated February 2, 2022. Document filed by Clipper Equity GP LLC, Clipper Equity LLC, Clipper Equity New York LP, Clipper Realty Inc...(Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER MOTION for Conference to seek leave to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Coyne dated February 2, 2022. Document filed by Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC, Alket Gjeci, Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium, Residential Management Group, LLC d/b/a Douglas Elliman Property Management..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alket Gjeci..(pc) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alket Gjeci, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Goddard, Megan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clipper Equity GP LLC, Clipper Equity LLC, Clipper Equity New York LP, Clipper Realty Inc., Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium, Residential Management Group, LLC d/b/a Douglas Elliman Property Management, Alket Gjeci with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Oliver Bautista..(Goddard, Megan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint and for an amendment to the case caption addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Coyne dated January 3, 2022. Document filed by Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC, Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155840/2021..Document filed by Douglas Elliman Commercial, LLC, Gramercy Square Condominiums, LLC, PR Gramercy Square Condominium..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher John Yee Coyne. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher John Yee Coyne to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher John Yee Coyne. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DOUGLAS ELLISMAN COMMERCIAL, LLC, GRAMERCY SQUARE CONDOMINIUMS, LLC, PR GRAMERCY SQUARE CONDOMINIUM, OLIVER BAUTISTA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Coyne, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155840/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25517640).Document filed by DOUGLAS ELLISMAN COMMERCIAL, LLC, GRAMERCY SQUARE CONDOMINIUMS, LLC, PR GRAMERCY SQUARE CONDOMINIUM..(Coyne, Christopher) Modified on 12/29/2021 (pc). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clipper Realty Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Dean Pollack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Beckman