This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2022 at 08:26:44 (UTC).

BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED et al v. MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and Thomas S Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Kleeh

Thomas S Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bausch Health Ireland Limited

Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Defendant

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JUSTIN JAMES HASFORD

Attorney at FINNEGAN HENDERSON FARABOW GARRETT & DUNNER, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

BRYAN C. DINER

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

SCOTT JOEL ETISH

Attorney at GIBBONS PC

1700 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Caitlin E. O'Connell

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Charles E. Lipsey

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

11955 Freedom Dr., Suite 800

Reston, VA 22190

Daniel R. Higginbotham

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann, PLLC

300 Summers Street, Suite 1380, P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Kyu Yun Kim

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Ashley Nichole Deem

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann, PLLC

300 Summers Street, Suite 1380, P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

J. BRUGH LOWER

Attorney at GIBBONS PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.

Attorney at GIBBONS, PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

Defendant Attorneys

ARNOLD B. CALMANN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Gordon H. Copland

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

William J O'Brien

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Aden M. Allen

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

900 S. Capital Of Texas Hwy, Las Cimas Iv, Fifth Floor

Austin, TX 78746-5546

Dennis Gregory

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

900 S. Capital Of Texas Hwy, Las Cimas Iv, Fifth Floor

Austin, TX 78746-5546

Jennifer A. Ward

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Nicole Stafford

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

900 S. Capital Of Texas Hwy, Las Cimas Iv, Fifth Floor

Austin, TX 78746-5546

Stephanie Cheng

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

633 W. Fifth Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

91 #6

Exhibit F

91 #5

Exhibit E

91 #4

Exhibit D

91 #3

Exhibit C

91 #2

Exhibit B

91 #1

Exhibit A

91 #91

Main Document

83 #8

Proposed Order

83 #83

Main Document

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

206 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Bausch Health Ireland Limited, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(dk) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION. The proposed First Amended Complaint will be entered on the docket. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s #83 MOTION is dismissed as moot. Defendants Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd., Viatris Inc., Agila Specialties Inc. and Mylan API US LLC terminated. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 5/5/2022. (dk) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION by Bausch Health Ireland Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation (Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Amended Complaint)(Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 400.00, received for Nicole Stafford and Dennis Gregory. Receipt number WVNC003437. (dk) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Dennis Gregory by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Nicole Stafford by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Copland, Gordon) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME: The parties to this matter STIPULATE and AGREE that the date by which Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's #83 MOTION to Strike is EXTENDED through and until 5/10/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 1/29/2022. (cnd) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) STIPULATION to Extension of Time by Bausch Health Ireland Limited, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MOTION to Strike Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Motion, Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F), to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - NJ Opinion, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - NJ Order, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Kim Email 4/12/22, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Ward Email 4/18/22, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Kim Email 4/18/22, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Ward Email 4/19/22, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Complaint, Hightlighted, #8 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Reset Answer deadline for All Defendants. (jss) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (DENI, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. AGILA SPECIALTIES INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; MYLAN API US LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; MYLAN INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; VIATRIS INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (DENI, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN JAMES HASFORD on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (HASFORD, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN C. DINER on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (DINER, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGILA SPECIALTIES INC., MYLAN API US LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VIATRIS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (LOWER, J.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AGILA SPECIALTIES INC., MYLAN API US LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. A VIATRIS COMPANY, VIATRIS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12418962), filed by BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/9/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Stafford